Kissick v. City Of Mesa, Arizona et al

Plaintiff: Lloyd P. Kissick
Defendant: City Of Mesa Police Department and City Of Mesa, Arizona
Case Number: 3:2019cv50117
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:19-cv-04620, filed 07/03/2019. (jjr, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the District of Arizona the electronic record. (kp, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for transfer #9 is granted. This case is ordered transferred to the District of Arizona, and is terminated without prejudice in this court. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick For Equitable Transfer (pg, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE To Notification Of Docket Entry by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick regarding complaint served on Mesa Police Department, City Of Mesa on 5/20/19(Summonses have not been issued by the court as of 5/22/19) (pg, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff has alleged that in May 2017, he was arrested on a warrant and subjected to excessive force by officers of the City of Mesa, Arizona. He names as Defendants the City of Mesa and the Mesa Police Department; he has not identified any individual officer who alleged violated his rights. The incident occurred in Arizona. Nothing about these allegations suggests that the court would have personal jurisdiction over the named Defendants, or over any individuals who might later be named as having been involved. Nor does it appear that venue is proper. Plaintiff is directed within 14 days to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in the District of Arizona. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to the Second Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 3/28/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2019.(jp, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400. #46243004364 (pg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lloyd P. Kissick; Jury Demand. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kissick v. City Of Mesa, Arizona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd P. Kissick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mesa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mesa, Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?