State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Montrief
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Michael Montrief
Case Number: 3:2019cv50137
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to other #15 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Sudekum, Frederick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff Motion to Remand by Michael Montrief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Liebovich, Theodore)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to answer counterclaim #12 is granted. Plaintiff's answer to the counterclaim is now due 14 days after a ruling on the motion to remand. Presentment of the motion for extension on 7/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (jk, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Florence M. Schumacher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 7/1/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Schumacher, Florence)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Counter Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for extension of time to file answer to Counterclaim (Schumacher, Florence)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: On plaintiff's motion to remand #9 , defendant shall respond by 7/11/2019 and plaintiff shall reply by 7/25/2019. Presentment of the motion set for 6/26/2019 is stricken. The initial status hearing set for 7/17/2019 and the deadline for the joint initial status report are also stricken. Any future hearing will be set by minute entry. Mailed notice (jk, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Florence M. Schumacher for presentment of motion to remand #9 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Schumacher, Florence)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion to Remand)(Schumacher, Florence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 7/10/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (jk, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Exhibits by Michael Montrief (Exhibit E) (Liebovich, Theodore)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Michael Montrief against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . by Michael Montrief(Liebovich, Theodore)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Florence M. Schumacher (Schumacher, Florence)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Frederick John Sudekum, III (Sudekum, Frederick)
June 11, 2019 MAILED notice of removal letter to Counsel for plaintiff (jp, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Montrief by Theodore Liebovich (Liebovich, Theodore)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Liebovich, Theodore)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal filed by Michael Montrief Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15915042. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Liebovich, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Montrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Florence M. Schumacher
Represented By: Frederick John Sudekum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Montrief
Represented By: Theodore Liebovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?