Pozniak v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Pozniak
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv50159
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Attachments: #1 001, #2 002, #3 003, #4 004, #5 005, #6 006, #7 007, #8 008)(Mallory, Monica)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Parties consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. This case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Lisa Jensen. Mailed notice (jp, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marcus, Meredith)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Mallory, Monica)
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Pozniak by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Pozniak by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elizabeth A. Pozniak; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16032021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pozniak v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Pozniak
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?