The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois et al v. Precast, LLC
Plaintiff: The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois and The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois
Defendant: Precast, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv50225
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Pursuant to notice of dismissal, this case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Any pending motions are now moot and all court dates are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sb, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois, The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois (Haggestad, Troy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status hearing held on 10/29/2019. The defendant was not present. Plaintiffs shall file a written status report on the status of the case by 11/22/2019. (yxp, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report by The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois, The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois (Haggestad, Troy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois, The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois as to Precast, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Haggestad, Troy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 AM. By 10/23/2019, the parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiffs are directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
September 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Precast, LLC (pg, )
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois and The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois by Joel M. L. Huotari (Huotari, Joel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois and The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois by Troy E. Haggestad (Haggestad, Troy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haggestad, Troy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois and The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16228780.(Haggestad, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois et al v. Precast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Construction Industry Retirement Fund of Rockford, Illinois
Represented By: Troy E. Haggestad
Represented By: Joel M. L. Huotari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Construction Industry Welfare Fund of Rockford, Illinois
Represented By: Troy E. Haggestad
Represented By: Joel M. L. Huotari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?