McNamara v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debra A. McNamara
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv50235
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jody Wilner Moran for presentment of motion for leave to appear, #14 before Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Moran, Jody)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 26, 2019 INITIAL STATUS HEARING OR, ALTERNATIVELY, RESCHEDULE INITIAL STATUS HEARING MOTION by Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. for leave to appear as Telephonically UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 26, 2019 INITIAL STATUS HEARING OR, ALTERNATIVELY, RESCHEDULE INITIAL STATUS HEARING (Moran, Jody)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: On 11/8/2019 the Court directed the parties to file a joint initial written status report by 11/20/2019. Dkt. 10. To date, the parties have not done so. The joint initial written status report is now due 11/22/2019 by 10:00 AM. (yxp, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION (Moran, Jody)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. to dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION (Moran, Jody)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The joint initial written status report is now due 11/20/2019. Mailed notice (jp, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. by Katherine H. Oblak (Oblak, Katherine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. by Jody Wilner Moran (Moran, Jody)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 11/26/2019 at 9:00 AM. By 11/22/2019, the parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. The plaintiff is directed to give notice of this order to any party filing an appearance. (yxp, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Debra A. McNamara. United Healthcare Services, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Rock, Jason)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: By 10/21/2019, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a status report informing the court of the status of service on the defendant. (yxp, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Debra A. McNamara by Jason H. Rock (Rock, Jason)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rock, Jason)
September 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Debra A. McNamara; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16261503. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Rock, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. McNamara
Represented By: Jason H. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Katherine H. Oblak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?