Baker v. CGH Medical Center Auxilliary
Plaintiff: Olivia Baker
Defendant: CGH Medical Center Auxilliary
Case Number: 3:2019cv50294
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Olivia Baker. CGH Medical Center Auxilliary waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Khare, Mohit)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: An initial status hearing is set for 3/02/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 2/24/2020. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (jk, )
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant CGH Medical Center Auxilliary (rc, )
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Olivia Baker by Mohit Khare (Khare, Mohit)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Khare, Mohit)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Olivia Baker; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16424724.(Khare, Mohit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. CGH Medical Center Auxilliary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGH Medical Center Auxilliary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Baker
Represented By: Mohit Khare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?