True Value Company, LLC et al v. International Hardware Supplies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: True Value Company, LLC and TV Cooperative Company
Defendant: International Hardware Supplies, LLC and President Jose Zambrano
Case Number: 3:2020cv50083
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Fred Viera of Change of Address (Viera, Fred)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CORRECTED ENTRY: ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice...Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020:Mailed notice(docket7, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/23/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Hardware Supplies, LLC, Jose Zambrano by Fred Viera (Viera, Fred)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Fred Viera's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Mr. Viera shall file his appearance for Defendants. Mailed notice (jk, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16793195. (Viera, Fred)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Defendants removed this action premised on diversity of citizenship. 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(1). However, they failed to properly allege the citizenship of several parties. Limited liability companies do not have citizenship for diversity purposes. The controlling citizenship is that of their members. To properly plead the citizenship of a limited liability company each member and the citizenship of each member must be identified. Meyerson v. Showboat Marina Casino Partnership, 312 F.3d. 318, 321 (7th Cir. 2002). A corporation is a citizen of both its state of incorporation and the state of its principal place of business. 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). Both must be pled. The principal place of business is where a corporation's executive headquarters are located. Illinois Bell Telephone Co., Inc. v. Global NAPs Illinois, Inc., 551 F.3d 587 (7th Cir. 2008). On or before March 24,2020, defendants shall file amended jurisdictional allegations properly pleading the citizenship of all parties or this case will be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice (sb, )
March 4, 2020 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel for plaintiffs. (jp, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Twenty-Second Circuit Court McHenry County, case number (19 LA 000387) filed by International Hardware Supplies, LLC, Jose Zambrano Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16787586. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chudoba, Brandi)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Hardware Supplies, LLC, Jose Zambrano by Mindy Renee Chudoba (Chudoba, Mindy)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Hardware Supplies, LLC, Jose Zambrano by Brandi L Chudoba (Chudoba, Brandi)
March 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Value Company, LLC et al v. International Hardware Supplies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Value Company, LLC
Represented By: Salvador Andrew Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TV Cooperative Company
Represented By: Salvador Andrew Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hardware Supplies, LLC
Represented By: Mindy Renee Chudoba
Represented By: Fred Viera
Represented By: Brandi L Chudoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Jose Zambrano
Represented By: Mindy Renee Chudoba
Represented By: Fred Viera
Represented By: Brandi L Chudoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?