Henderson v. DeKalb Community Unit School District 428 et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Henderson
Defendant: John Panek, Amanda Baum, Doe Bus Driver, Cristy Meyer, Jamie Craven, Brant Boyer, Kyle Gerdes, Tim Vincent, Jennie Gammelgaard, Sharon Carani and DeKalb Community Unit School District 428
Case Number: 3:2020cv50124
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The initial status hearing set for 7/16/2020 is stricken. The joint initial status report remains due 7/09/2020. Mailed notice (jk, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 JURY Demand (Jeffrey, Antonio)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Dominique Henderson against All Defendants to Redact Minor Name per Court Order (Jeffrey, Antonio)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #10 is stricken. Defendants' amended unopposed motion for extension of time #12 is granted. Defendants shall file their answer or responsive pleading on or before 5/14/20. The 4/17/20 notice of motion date is hereby stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Patrick Mckeown for presentment of motion to amend/correct #12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/17/2020 at 01:00 PM. (Mckeown, Kevin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant DeKalb Community Unit School District 428 to amend/correct MOTION by Defendant DeKalb Community Unit School District 428 for extension of time to file answer #10 (Mckeown, Kevin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Patrick Mckeown for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/17/2020 at 01:00 PM. (Mckeown, Kevin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant DeKalb Community Unit School District 428 for extension of time to file answer (Mckeown, Kevin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Initial status hearing set for 7/16/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 7/09/2020. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. The attached complaint to the notice of removal #1 references the full name of a minor in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. The Clerk is directed to provisionally seal the complaint. By 4/24/2020 Plaintiff is directed to file a version of the complaint with the minor's name redacted or only identified by initials as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(3). All future filings shall only use the initials of the minor. Mailed notice (jk, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominique Henderson by Antonio Jeffrey (Jeffrey, Antonio)
April 9, 2020 MAILED notice of removal to counsel for plaintiff. (jp, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice (jp, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
April 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bakhtiari, Babak)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amanda Baum, Brant Boyer, Sharon Carani, Jamie Craven, DeKalb Community Unit School District 428, Doe Bus Driver, Jennie Gammelgaard, Kyle Gerdes, Cristy Meyer, John Panek, Tim Vincent by Kevin Patrick Mckeown (Mckeown, Kevin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amanda Baum, Brant Boyer, Sharon Carani, Jamie Craven, DeKalb Community Unit School District 428, Doe Bus Driver, Jennie Gammelgaard, Kyle Gerdes, Cristy Meyer, John Panek, Tim Vincent by Babak Bakhtiari (Bakhtiari, Babak)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit DeKalb County, case number (2020 L 20) filed by Amanda Baum, Brant Boyer, Sharon Carani, Jamie Craven, DeKalb Community Unit School District 428, Doe Bus Driver, Jennie Gammelgaard, Kyle Gerdes, Cristy Meyer, John Panek, Tim Vincent Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16923101. Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bakhtiari, Babak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. DeKalb Community Unit School District 428 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Panek
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Baum
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Bus Driver
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristy Meyer
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Craven
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant Boyer
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Gerdes
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Vincent
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Gammelgaard
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Carani
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb Community Unit School District 428
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Henderson
Represented By: Antonio Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?