Rockey et al v. R&R Trucking
Plaintiff: John Rockey, Taylor Rockey, Rikki Rocky and Rikki Rockey
Defendant: R&R Trucking
Case Number: 3:2021cv50015
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant R&R Trucking (jmk, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 3/22/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Having reviewed Plaintiff's amended complaint #5 , the Court is satisfied with the sufficiency of Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations. (yxp, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED complaint by John Rockey, Taylor Rockey, Rikki Rocky, Rikki Rockey against All Defendants (Mahoney, Timothy)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; Plaintiffs have until February 15, 2021, to amend the complaint to allege the citizenship of Plaintiffs and investigate and allege the citizenship of all the members of R&R Trucking if it is a limited liability company. If R&R Trucking is a general corporation, then its allegations of citizenship as currently pleaded is fine. See attachment for full detail. Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 1/14/2021: (yxp, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Rockey, Taylor Rockey, Rikki Rockey, Rikki Rocky by Timothy Sean Mahoney (Mahoney, Timothy)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mahoney, Timothy)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Rockey, Taylor Rockey, Rikki Rockey ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17824931.(Mahoney, Timothy)
January 13, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockey et al v. R&R Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rockey
Represented By: Timothy Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Rockey
Represented By: Timothy Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikki Rocky
Represented By: Timothy Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikki Rockey
Represented By: Timothy Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?