Wagner v. Freeport Memorial Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Maddison Elizabeth Wagner
Defendant: Dr. Kevin Draxinger, Unknown Employees Of Freeport Memorial Hospital and Freeport Memorial Hospital doing business as FHN Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 3:2021cv50076
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 5/11/2021. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of this Court's joint initial status report. Mailed notice. (vk)
March 11, 2021 MAILED copy of order dated 3/11/2021 and this Court's joint initial status report to Maddison Elizabeth Wagner. (jp, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Having reviewed Plaintiff's amended complaint #5 , the Court is satisfied with the sufficiency of Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations. (yxp, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint and 0 copies by Maddison Elizabeth Wagner (pg, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: On review of Plaintiff's complaint, the Court is not convinced that it has subject-matter jurisdiction over the action. Plaintiff must allege a corporation's principal place of business and the state of incorporation. 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1); Hertz Corp. v. Friend, 559 U.S. 77, 8081 (2010). Both are required, but only one is present in the complaint. Dkt. 1. Therefore, Plaintiff is ordered to amend the complaint to properly allege diversity of citizenship by March 9, 2021. Mailed notice (yxp, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Maddison Elizabeth Wagner (pg, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Maddison Elizabeth Wagner (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Freeport Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kevin Draxinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees Of Freeport Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport Memorial Hospital doing business as FHN Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maddison Elizabeth Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?