Orosz v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Orosz
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv50181
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file the administrative record #8 is unopposed and granted. Defendant shall file the administrative record by 9/7/2021. Mailed notice. (vk)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mallory, Monica)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Mallory, Monica)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher M. Orosz. (vk)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. Mailed notice. (vk)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher M. Orosz by Robert Gross Tarlock (Tarlock, Robert)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher M. Orosz by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher M. Orosz for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Daley, Frederick)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Christopher M. Orosz; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orosz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Orosz
Represented By: Robert Gross Tarlock
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?