Durin v. Kishwaukee Community College et al
Plaintiff: Steve Durin
Defendant: Laurie Borowicz and Kishwaukee Community College
Case Number: 3:2021cv50206
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steve Durin. (Kreamer, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steve Durin. Steve Durin waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Urani, Joseph)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 8/2/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steve Durin by Joseph E Urani (Urani, Joseph)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steve Durin by John C Kreamer (Kreamer, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kreamer, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steve Durin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18275049.(Kreamer, John)
May 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durin v. Kishwaukee Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Borowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kishwaukee Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Durin
Represented By: John C Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?