Williams v. Molson Coors Beverage Company
Plaintiff: Darren Williams
Defendant: Molson Coors Beverage Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv50207
Filed: May 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint #9 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint by 8/2/2021. The parties' 8/16/2021 status report deadline is stricken. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 9/8/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendant Molson Coors Beverage Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/12/2021. The parties' joint initial status report is now due 8/16/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Darren Williams to amend/correct complaint #1 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darren Williams for joinder adding defendant and plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sheehan, Spencer)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Darren Williams regarding Summons and Complaint served on Casey Pineda - SOP Manager on 07/22/2021 (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darren Williams by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darren Williams by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darren Williams by Peter Scott Lubin (Lubin, Peter)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 8/2/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to obtain local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.15. Mailed notice. (vk)
May 25, 2021 MAILED Local Rule 83.15 to Counsel for plaintiff. (jp, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darren Williams by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer)
May 24, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Molson Coors Beverage Company (cp, )
May 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
May 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer)
May 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darren Williams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18276803.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Molson Coors Beverage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Williams
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: Peter Scott Lubin
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Beverage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?