Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. v. Trudeau et al
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.
Defendant: Questcor International, Ltd., Mallinckrodt ARD IP Unlimited CO., Mallinckrodt Pharma IP Trading Unlimited CO., Acthar IP Unlimited CO., Therakos Emea Ltd., Mallinckrodt ARD, LLC, ST. Shared Services, LLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Ltd., Mallinckrodt LUX IP S.a.r.l., Express Scripts Holding Company, Mallinckrodt Specialty Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Ltd., Mallinckrodt UK LTD, Mallinckrodt PLC, Bryan Reasons, Acthar IP, Accredo Health Group, Inc., Stephen Welch, Mallinckrodt International Finance SA, ALIXPARTNERS, LLP, Dr. Kneeland Youngblood, M.D., M.D., Ph.D. Carlos V. Paya, Curascript, Inc., Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt Equinox Finance LLC, Mallinckrodt Petten Holdings B.V., Mallinckrodt ARD IP Limited CO., MEH Inc., Sonorant Therapeutics Ltd., United Biosource Corporation, Express Scripts, Inc., Mallinckrodt IP Unlimited Co., ST US HOLDINGS LLC, ST Operations LLC, Questcor Operations Ltd., ST US POOL LLC, Mark Trudeau, Curascript SD, Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc. doing business as Curascript SD and Curascript Specialty Distribution SD, Questcor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt ARD Holdings, Inc., David Norton, David Carlucci, Mallinckrodt Hospital Products IP Unlimited CO., Hugh O'Neill, Akasia Ltd., Petten Holdings Inc., Joann Reed, Angus Russell, Mallinckrodt Group S.A.R.L., Cigna Holding Company, Mallinckrodt ARD, Inc., Mallinckrodt US Holdings, LLC, J. Martin Carroll, Mallinckrodt Pharma IP Trading Designated Activity CO., Cigna Corporation, Anne C. Whitaker and Paul R. Carter
Case Number: 3:2021cv50215
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: In light of the notice of voluntary dismissal #12 filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk is directed to terminate the following defendants: Mark Trudeau, Hugh O'Neill, Angus Russell, David Carlucci, J. Martin Carroll, Paul R. Carter, David Norton, Bryan Reasons, Joann Reed, and Kneeland Youngblood. The case shall proceed against the remaining defendants, though the case remains stayed, see Dkt. 11. (yxp, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Flowers, Peter)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The joint motion to stay #9 is granted. The case is stayed until the earlier of the plan confirmation, the automatic stay is lifted in the bankruptcy cases, or the Preliminary Injunction Order is vacated. The parties shall file a joint status report every 90 days on the status of the bankruptcy proceedings with the first report due by 9/7/2021. Mailed notice. (vk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Accredo Health Group, Inc., Cigna Corporation, Cigna Holding Company, Curascript SD, Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc., United Biosource Corporation by Jan H. Ohlander (local counsel) (Ohlander, Jan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Accredo Health Group, Inc., Cigna Corporation, Cigna Holding Company, Curascript SD, Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc., United Biosource Corporation to stay Agreed Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation to Stay Case, #2 Proposed Agreed Order Regarding Stay)(Lyle, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Accredo Health Group, Inc., Cigna Corporation, Cigna Holding Company, Curascript SD, Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc., United Biosource Corporation by Michael John Lyle (Lyle, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 8/10/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case be reassigned to the calendar of Judge Iain D. Johnston. Case reassigned to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen for all further proceedings. Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2021. (jp, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice #4 , defendants listed in Exhibit A of the notice are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Electronic notice (sb, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flowers, Peter)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flowers, Peter)
June 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc. (crl, )
June 3, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Mallinckrodt ARD, LLC, United Biosource Corporation. (crl, )
June 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ALIXPARTNERS, LLP, Accredo Health Group, Inc., Acthar IP Unlimited CO., David Carlucci, J. Martin Carroll, Cigna Corporation, Curascript SD, Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., MEH Inc., Mallinckrodt ARD IP Unlimited CO., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt Equinox Finance LLC, Mallinckrodt Group S.A.R.L., Mallinckrodt Hospital Products IP Unlimited CO., Mallinckrodt IP Unlimited Co., Mallinckrodt International Finance SA, Mallinckrodt LUX IP S.a.r.l., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Petten Holdings B.V., Mallinckrodt Pharma IP Trading Unlimited CO., Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Ltd., Mallinckrodt UK LTD, Mallinckrodt US Holdings, LLC, Hugh O'Neill, Carlos V. Paya, Petten Holdings Inc., Questcor International, Ltd., Angus Russell, ST Operations LLC, ST US HOLDINGS LLC, ST US POOL LLC, ST. Shared Services, LLC, Sonorant Therapeutics Ltd., Therakos Emea Ltd., Mark Trudeau, Anne C. Whitaker, Kneeland Youngblood, M.D. (crl, )
June 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cigna Holding Company, Mallinckrodt ARD Holdings, Inc. (crl, )
May 28, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United Biosource Corporation (cp, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter)
May 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
May 27, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mallinckrodt ARD, LLC, David Norton, Bryan Reasons, Joann Reed, Stephen Welch (crl, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18291781. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Flowers, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. v. Trudeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Questcor International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD IP Unlimited CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharma IP Trading Unlimited CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acthar IP Unlimited CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therakos Emea Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. Shared Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LUX IP S.a.r.l.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Specialty Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt UK LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Reasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acthar IP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredo Health Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt International Finance SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIXPARTNERS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kneeland Youngblood, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D., Ph.D. Carlos V. Paya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curascript, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Equinox Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Petten Holdings B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD IP Limited CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEH Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonorant Therapeutics Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Biosource Corporation
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt IP Unlimited Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST US HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Questcor Operations Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST US POOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curascript SD
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Healthcare Corp. and Priority Healthcare Distribution, Inc. doing business as Curascript SD and Curascript Specialty Distribution SD
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Questcor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carlucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Hospital Products IP Unlimited CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akasia Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petten Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Group S.A.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Holding Company
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt US Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Martin Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharma IP Trading Designated Activity CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Jan H. Ohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne C. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?