Munoz et al v. Bradbury et al
Plaintiff: Ismael Munoz and Cynthia Munoz
Defendant: Ben Fritz, Tony Bradbury, Carissa Morrissey, Jacob Maratos, Jennifer Hawley and Doug Quinn
Case Number: 3:2021cv50231
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Tony Bradbury, Ben Fritz, Jennifer Hawley, Jacob Maratos, Carissa Morrissey, Doug Quinn. (jp, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 8/31/2021. Following the appearance of Defendants, defense counsel shall coordinate with Plaintiffs in order to confer and jointly file the status report. If no defendant has appeared before the initial status report is due, Plaintiffs shall file their own status report updating the Court on the status of serving Defendants. Plaintiffs are directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Plaintiffs are also directed to the District Court Pro Se Assistance Program. An appointment may be scheduled by calling (312) 435-5691. Additional information is available on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for access to A Guide for the Pro Se Litigant (located under "Information for People without Lawyers"). Mailed notice. (vk)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ismael Munoz (pg, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Paid Filing Fee Of $402.00 on 7/14/2021. #46243006378 by Cynthia Munoz (pg, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied due to an insufficient showing of indigency. Plaintiff claims a take-home pay of $2,400 per month and an additional $1,800 per month in government assistance to care for her nine children. She has not, however, shown adequate expenses to justify proceeding without paying the Court's filing fee. Thus, she is ordered to pay the filing fee by July 15, 2021. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal. Mailed notice (yxp, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Cynthia Munoz. (jp, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiffs Cynthia Munoz, Ismael Munoz for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Cynthia Munoz, Ismael Munoz; Jury Demand. (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz et al v. Bradbury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carissa Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Maratos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?