Griffin v. United States of America
Petitioner: Charles Griffin
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv50291
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The government's motion for access to sealed portion of 1/3/2020 change of plea transcript and for extension of time #6 is granted. The Court finds that movant Charles Griffin has waived the attorney-client privilege (at least in part) by asserting his claims in this case and that the sealed portion of the transcript is within the scope of the waiver and relevant to the claims. The due date for the government's response to the section 2255 motion is extended to 10/15/2021. The due date for Mr. Griffin's reply to the response is extended to 10/29/2021. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Respondent United States of America for Access to Sealed Portion of January 3, 2020 Change of Plea Transcript in Criminal Case No. 18 CR 50010 , MOTION by Respondent United States of America for extension of time to file response/reply to 2255 Motion (Bucci, Talia)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to vacate, set, aside or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. (gcy, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Charles Griffin's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied as moot because there is no filing fee for a motion under 28 USC 2255. Defendant's motion under 28 USC 2255 is taken under advisement. The government is directed to file a response to the motion by 9/15/2021. Mr. Griffin is directed to file a reply to the response by 9/29/2021. Mailed notice. (mma, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Charles Griffin for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Charles Griffin (18cr50010) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Talia M. Bucci
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?