Combs v. LDF Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, LDF Holdings, LLC, Midaaswi, LLC, Jessi Phillips Lorenzo and Jessi Lee Phillips
Case Number: 3:2021cv50307
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Margaret J Schneider
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #10 , is granted. Defendants have until 10/22/21 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Deadline for filing of joint initial status report of 10/01/21 and initial telephonic status hearing set for 10/08/21 are stricken. Joint initial status report is now due 10/29/21. Initial telephonic status conference is reset to 11/05/21 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants LDF Holdings, LLC, Midaaswi, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Lamer, Bryant)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lauren Combs. LDF Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Kim, David)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lauren Combs. Midaaswi, LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Kim, David)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LDF Holdings, LLC, Midaaswi, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo by Bryant Todd Lamer (Lamer, Bryant)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 10/08/21 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Plaintiff and lead defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 10/01/21. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice (jp, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Combs as to Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo on 8/7/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Kim, David)
August 12, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant LDF Holdings, LLC. (jmk, )
August 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Midaaswi, LLC and Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo. (lxk, )
August 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LDF Holdings, LLC. (lxk, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by David See Kim (Kim, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by Lauren Combs ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18522110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Edelman, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. LDF Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midaaswi, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Represented By: David See Kim
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?