Karastev v. Garnett
Plaintiff: Michael Karastev
Respondent: Rob Jeffreys and Jason Garnett
Case Number: 3:2021cv50327
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Jason Garnett by John Edwin Nowak (Nowak, John)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER with Statement; Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by October 25, 2021. Petitioner shall reply by November 24, 2021. The Clerk is instructed to: (1) terminate Respondent Rob Jeffreys; (2) add Jason Garnett, Chief of Parole, Illinois Department of Corrections, as Respondent; and, (3) alter the case caption to Karastev v. Garnett. See the attached order for details. Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 8/30/2021: (yxp, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 21cv4389. (jp, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. Pursuant to transfer order: #4 . (kl, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk shall transfer this matter forthwith to a Judge of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/20/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Karastev by Marc M. Barnett (Barnett, Marc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barnett, Marc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Michael Karastev against Michael Karastev Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-18577678.(Barnett, Marc)
August 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karastev v. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Karastev
Represented By: Marc M. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Garnett
Represented By: John Edwin Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?