Gakuba v. Warden
Petitioner: Peter Gakuba
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2021cv50383
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 RECEIVED from Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-02498
October 7, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/5/2021. (c/m 10/06/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/7/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Electronic File by Peter Gakuba(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/7/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Hearing filed by Peter Gakuba. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/7/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Gakuba(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/7/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Peter Gakuba. (Attachments: #1 Venue Statement)(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gakuba v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Gakuba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?