Lee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Keith M. Lee
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv50469
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 001, #2 002, #3 003, #4 004, #5 005)(Brady, Jana)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The above-captioned case is currently pending on my calendar. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Lisa A. Jensen pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Parties have consented to the reassignment as indicated below. [See Attached] Signed by Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 12/15/2021. (jp, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Sloan, Stephen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Jana L Brady as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Brady, Jana)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith M. Lee by Stephen M Sloan (Sloan, Stephen)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith M. Lee by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Keith M. Lee; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18964094. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)
December 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, )
December 13, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith M. Lee
Represented By: Stephen M Sloan
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Jana L Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?