Haynes v. Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC
Plaintiff: Heather Haynes
Defendant: Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv50475
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Margaret J Schneider
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Motion hearing on Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC's agreed motion for approval of settlement held on 05/12/22. The agreed motion to approve the settlement agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC #13 , is granted. For the reasons stated in open court, the Court finds that the settlement represents a fair and reasonable resolution of a bona fide dispute under the Fair Labor Standards Act. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC, are dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal will automatically convert to a dismissal with prejudice on 06/02/22, without further order of court. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jxk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the telephonic status conference set for 04/28/22 is stricken and reset to 05/12/22 at 9:15 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (jp, )
April 12, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: In light of the parties' joint consent #15 the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Judge Schneider for all purposes. (yxp, )
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Michael, David)
April 12, 2022 Case referred to the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. (jp, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: The Court is in receipt of the parties' motion for approval of settlement #13 . If the parties wish to consent before Magistrate Judge Schneider, they should file the Court's Notice and Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form, found on Judge Schneider's webpage, and file before 04/28/22. This matter remains set for 04/28/22 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will hear the motion at that time. If the parties do not enter a consent to jurisdiction, the Court will issue a report and recommendation on the motion. Joint initial status report due 04/21/22, is stricken. Mailed notice. (jxk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC for settlement (AGREED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE)(Michael, David)
March 11, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 04/28/22 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and lead defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 04/21/22. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk)
March 11, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 04/28/22 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and lead defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 04/21/21. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's second agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #9 , is granted. Defendant has until 04/04/22 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.Mailed notice. (jxk)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 AGREED (Brookstein, Mark)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's Agreed Motion for an Initial Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #5 , is granted. Defendant has until 03/03/22 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint. Mailed notice. (jxk)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC (Brookstein, Mark)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 AGREED (Brookstein, Mark)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC by Mark Douglas Brookstein (Brookstein, Mark)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC by David N. Michael (Michael, David)
December 22, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC. (lxk, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Heather Haynes by Michael Louis Fradin (Fradin, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heather Haynes; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18989852. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Haynes Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fradin, Michael)
December 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
December 21, 2021 MAILED Local Rule 83.16 to counsel for plaintiff. (jp, )
December 21, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Haynes
Represented By: Michael Louis Fradin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-States Concrete Industries, LLC
Represented By: David N. Michael
Represented By: Mark Douglas Brookstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?