Lauren Combs v. Aaniiih Nakoda Finance, LLC dba Bright Lending et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Defendant: AANIIIH Nakoda Finance, LLC doing business as Bright Lending, Total Management, Inc doing business as Bright Management doing business as TMI Total Management, Benjamin E. Gatzke, BWDS, LLC and BorrowWorks, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv50013
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties' joint initial status report, using the form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports, is now due 4/26/2022. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
March 3, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lauren Combs. AANIIIH Nakoda Finance, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lauren Combs. Benjamin E. Gatzke waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Combs as to BWDS, LLC on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Combs as to BorrowWorks, LLC on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BWDS, LLC, BorrowWorks, LLC (dxb, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 First AMENDED complaint by Lauren Combs against AANIIIH Nakoda Finance, LLC, Benjamin E. Gatzke, BWDS, LLC, BorrowWorks, LLC and terminating Total Management, Inc (First Amended Complaint - Class Action) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Edelman, Daniel)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint #7 is granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separately docketed entry. Mailed notice. (vk)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The presentment of the motion for leave to amend #7 set for 3/1/2022 to Judge Johnston is stricken. (yxp, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to amend/correct #7 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 3/1/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Edelman, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Lauren Combs to amend/correct Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Edelman, Daniel)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Combs as to Total Management, Inc on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Benjamin E. Gatzke. (ey, )
January 25, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Benjamin E. Gatzke (ak, )
January 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AANIIIH Nakoda Finance, LLC, Total Management, Inc (jmk, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 3/14/2022. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Lauren Combs; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19050368. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)
January 12, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
January 12, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauren Combs v. Aaniiih Nakoda Finance, LLC dba Bright Lending et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AANIIIH Nakoda Finance, LLC doing business as Bright Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Management, Inc doing business as Bright Management doing business as TMI Total Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin E. Gatzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorrowWorks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?