Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.
Debtor: Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.
Trustee: Thomas Riske
Us Trustee: United States Trustee
Case Number: 3:2021bk30409
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#59 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/30/2021. (Admin.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 59 Consent Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay and Approving Adequate Protection Payments to Hitachi Capital America Corp. and Determining The Value of Certain Collateral (Related Doc #46) (jl)
July 27, 2021 Filing 58 Minutes of Court (related document(s)#8Status Hearing Sub Chapter V Held, #46 Resolving Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.). (tf)
July 26, 2021 Filing 57 Stipulation Between Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. and Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. (related document(s)#46 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.). (Phelps, Michael)
July 21, 2021 Filing 56 Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). (Skaggs, Mark)
July 13, 2021 Filing 55 Objection to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. (related document(s)#46 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.). (Wallace, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Filing 54 Status Report Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Filing 53 Agreed Order Resolving Motion For Adequate Protection or in the alternative, Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (Related Doc #14) (jl)
July 1, 2021 Filing 52 Minutes of Court (related document(s)#14 Resolving Motion for Adequate Protection or in the alternative, Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC). Proposed Order due by 7/12/2021. (jf)
July 1, 2021 Filing 51 Exhibit -Seperate Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 4001-2.B.1 Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. (related document(s)#46 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.). (Phelps, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Filing 50 Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. (related document(s)#49 Order). (Phelps, Michael)
June 30, 2021 Filing 49 IT IS ORDERED that the creditor shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order in which to file the separate statement, to serve the separate statement and the motion for relief on any affected entities/parties, and to file a certificate evidencing service on any affected entities/parties. Miscellaneous Deadline: 7/7/2021. (jl)
June 29, 2021 Filing 48 Notice of Motion Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. (related document(s)#46 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.). Objections to Motion due: 7/13/2021.Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (Phelps, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 47 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(21-30409-lkg) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8412775, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
June 29, 2021 Filing 46 Motion for Relief from Stay Description of Property: 2016 Hino 338 with 2016 Crown 10 Gravel Dump Bed. Fee Amount $ 188. Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp. (Phelps, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 45 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.. (Phelps, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 44 Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 43 Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 42 Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 41 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 40 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 39 Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 38 Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 37 Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 36 Schedule D: Non-Individual - Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 35 Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 34 Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting Third Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc #32) Incomplete Filings due by 6/28/2021. (jl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 32 Third Motion to Extend Time Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. (Wallace, Steven)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc #19) (jl)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc #18) (jl)
June 24, 2021 Filing 29 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.. (Kye, Matthew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 28 SDIL District Court Receipt Number 34625106695, Fee Amount $400.00 (related document(s)#18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor Plumbers Local 101 Pension Fund, Creditor Plumbers and Fitters Local 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Creditor Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust, Creditor Plumbers and Fitters Local Union 101, #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor Plumbers Local No. 360 Pension Fund, Creditor Plumbers Local No. 360 Health and Welfare Fund, Creditor Plumbers Local No. 360 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Program Trust, Creditor United Association of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of United States and Canada, Local No. 360) (hm)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#23 Status Hearing Scheduled) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2021. (Admin.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 Objection to Motion for Adequate Protection or in the Alternative Motion for Relief of Stay Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. (related document(s)#14 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC, Motion for Relief From Stay). (Wallace, Steven)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time. The Status Hearing presently scheduled on this matter for July 13, 2021 is CANCELLED. (Related Doc #24) Incomplete Filings due by 6/24/2021. (jl)
June 21, 2021 Filing 24 Second Motion to Extend Time Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. (Wallace, Steven)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 Status Hearing Scheduled RE: Schedules Due. Status Hearing before Judge Laura K. Grandy scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (kw)
June 19, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) No. of Notices: 127. Notice Date 06/19/2021. (Admin.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/12/2021 at 01:00 PM at 341 MTG RM 650 MO AVE (TELEPHONIC). Proof of Claims due by 8/10/2021. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/10/2021. (jl)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc #17) Incomplete Filings due by 6/18/2021. (jl)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors United Association of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of United States and Canada, Local No. 360, Plumbers Local No. 360 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Program Trust, Plumbers Local No. 360 Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers Local No. 360 Pension Fund (Martin, Janine)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors Plumbers and Fitters Local Union 101, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust, Plumbers and Fitters Local 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers Local 101 Pension Fund (Martin, Janine)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to Extend Time Filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc. (Wallace, Steven)
June 9, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Motion Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC (related document(s)#14 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC, Motion for Relief From Stay). Objections to Motion due: 6/23/2021.Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (Maune, Melinda)
June 9, 2021 Filing 15 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(21-30409-lkg) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8402959, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Adequate Protection , or in the alternative Motion for Relief from Stay Description of Property: 2017 Ford Transit Van VIN: NM0LE7E7XH1323469 & 2017 Ford Transit Van VIN: NM0LE7E72H1315544. Fee Amount $ 188. Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC (Maune, Melinda)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP. (Rawal, Arvind)
June 5, 2021 Filing 12 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC. (Maune, Melinda)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#8 Status Hearing Sub Chapter V) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/04/2021. (Admin.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#6 For Plan and Disc. Stmt) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2021. (Admin.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#7 Order and Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2021. (Admin.)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Subchapter V Status Hearing (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.). Status Hearing before Judge Laura K. Grandy scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. Pre-Status Report Due: 7/13/2021. (kw)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order and Deficiency Notice. Incomplete Filings due by 06/15/2021. (jl)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order requiring Debtor in Possession to set up separate accounts, file reports, and to file a plan. (jl)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Bank of Belleville. (Volmert, Deborah)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration re: Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Trustee Thomas Riske (related document(s)#3 Notice Appointing Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee). (Riske, Thomas)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appointment of Trustee Thomas Riske. Thomas Riske added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Skaggs, Mark)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-30409) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8398509, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/29/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 06/15/2021. Schedule A/B due by 06/15/2021. Schedule D due by 06/15/2021. Schedule E/F due by 06/15/2021. Schedule G due by 06/15/2021. Schedule H due by 06/15/2021. Statement of Affairs due by 06/15/2021. Disclosure of Attorney Compensation due by 06/15/2021. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 06/15/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 06/15/2021. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due: 08/30/2021. (Wallace, Steven)

Search for this case: Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Spengler Plumbing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Riske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Mark D Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?