Hood v. Menard Tactical Team et al
Case Number: 3:2005cv00214
Filed: March 29, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Denying 76 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/10/2011. (jdh, )
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Richard L Hood against Warden MacAdory. The Court further orders that Hood's claims against the Menard Tactical Team and Unknown Correctional Employees are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/7/2011. (jdh)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Decision 67 . The Court affirms 63 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge and rejects 62 Motion to Disqualify Judge Wilkerson from this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/14/2010. (dka, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to docket Hood's August 18, 2010 filing 64 as an Appeal from Magistrate Judge's Order and to send a copy of this order to USCA7. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/26/2010. (dka, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in its entirety 36 ; denying 31 Motion for relief from entry of default; denying 32 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss and denying 40 Motion for Leave to File an answer instanter filed by Warden MacAdory in light of the entry of default which remains in place after this Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/1/2010. (dka, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Dismissing without prejudice Hood's claims against the unidentified defendants. Unknown Correctional Employees and Unknown Party terminated. Referring this matter to Judge Wilkerson for a hearing to determine the amount of damages, if any, and a Report and Recommendation. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/23/09. (bkl)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 ; granting 22 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard L Hood. Court declines to determine the amount of damges, if any, or to enter judgment at this time due to the existence of other claims in this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/5/09. (dka, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Menard Tactical Team et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?