Ellis v. Health Services USP Marion, IL et al
Plaintiff: Edward B. Ellis
Defendant: Health Services USP Marion, IL, M Chastain, David F. Szoke, Charles Welch and Leslee Duncan
Case Number: 3:2008cv00628
Filed: September 4, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R Herndon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/30/10. (klh, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; and adopting 53 Report and Recommendations. Order dismissing Counts 1 and 3 for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and dismissing Count 2 pursuant to Plaintiff's motion. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/17/10. (klh, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M Chastain, David F. Szoke, Leslee Duncan, United States of America, Charles Welch. Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson referral terminated. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/2/2010. (jmp)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. Signed by Chief Judge David R Herndon on 2/3/09. (klh, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Ellis to file pleadings only through his court appointed lawyer. See Order for details.. Signed by Chief Judge David R Herndon on 1/16/09. (klh, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER VACATING prior Memorandum and Order (Doc. 7); GRANTING motion to appoint counsel (Doc. 3); and appointing attorney Matthew Booker. Signed by Chief Judge David R Herndon on 12/15/2008. (jwt)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson; Dismissing all claims against Defendant Health Services USP Marion, IL; and Substituting United States of America as Defendant for Count 2 of the complaint (FTCA claim). Signed by Chief Judge David R Herndon on 12/11/2008. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Health Services USP Marion, IL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Services USP Marion, IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F. Szoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslee Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?