Jenkins v. Hathaway et al
Plaintiff: George Jr Jenkins
Defendant: Judy Hathaway, Ms James and Unknown Party
Case Number: 3:2009cv00914
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CLERK'S JUDGMENT- (NJR/jdh) Plaintiff's claims against defendants Judy Hathaway and Ms. James are dimissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Jane Doe are dismissed witout prejudice. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/14/2011. (jdh)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/14/10. (alg)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/13/2010. (jwt)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson; Dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Hathaway pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2); Dismissal counts as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(g); Defendant Hathaway dismissed as a defendant; and Denying 7 MOTION for Status of Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/7/2010. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Hathaway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jr Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?