Hogsett v. USA
Petitioner: Samuel R. Hogsett, Jr.
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2010cv00010
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. The Court does not have jurisdiction to consider Petitioner's Motions (Docs. 49 & 50 ) and DISMISSES them for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/2/15. (ajr)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Samuel R. Hogsett, Jr. Petitioner shall submit payment to the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $4.77 on or before 7/15/2013. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 06/14/2013. (jst)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. A Certificate of Appealability shall NOT be issued. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 03/27/2013. (jst)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Control Order. Petitioner's amended petition shall be filed on or before 1/19/2011. Government's response shall be filed on or before 1/31/2011. Petitioner's Reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 2/8/2011. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 10/18/2010. (jaf)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Directing Government to respond to the Section 2255 motion; Denying as moot 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255); Granting 5 MOTION for Leave to File. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 6/23/2010. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogsett v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel R. Hogsett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Nicole E. Gorovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?