Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis v. Darr et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Defendant: Lanny H. Darr, II, James Corey Miller and Kimberly Miller
Case Number: 3:2010cv00130
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 131 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 120 ) is DENIED, and the Temporary Restraining Order entered on May 13, 2016 is DISSOLVED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/13/2016. (hjg)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - The Court GRANTS the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis (Doc. 118 ). A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 120 ) is set for 5/27/2016 09:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/13/2016. (hjg)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REINSTATING Counts II and III of plaintiffs' complaint and REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud no longer assigned to case. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/1/12. (klh, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/3/10. (klh, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 41 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis. The Court AWARDS $350.00 to Plaintiffs in costs and AWARDS Plaintiffs $27,643.75 in attorneys fees. Therefore, the Court AWARDS a total of $27,993.75 to Plaintiffs to be paid by Defendant Lanny H. Darr II. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/24/10. (skp)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis against James Corey Miller, Kimberly Miller, Lanny H. Darr, II. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/5/10. (skp)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 5 7 MOTIONS for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis. (Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/25/2010 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon.)Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/18/10. (klh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis v. Darr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: James E Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanny H. Darr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Corey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?