Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. King et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Thomas A. King and Paula King
Case Number: 3:2010cv00331
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 44 MOTION for Order to Approve Report of Sale and Distribution and for Possession filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/25/2014. (jdh)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT DECREE AND ORDER DIRECTING SALE granting 37 Motion for Default Judgment as to Thomas A. King and Paula King, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/30/2011. (ktc)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company ("Deutsche Bank") is ordered to file an amended complaint that properly alleges Deutsche Bank's citizenship for purposes of federal subject matter jurisdiction in diversity on or before Friday, May 21, 2010; see order for specifics. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 5/7/2010. (jhs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Matthew C. Abad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?