Mudge v. Scotts Miracle-Gro Company
Plaintiff: Robert M. Mudge
Defendant: The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00402
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/dka) dismissing case without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/21/2011. (dka, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court orders the defendant to file a report on the status of the Wham-O appeal during the month of September every year and within 30 days after the Federal Circuit issues its mandate. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/28/2011. (jdh)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Granting 17 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Stauffer v. Brooks Bros., Inc. filed by The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company. Case stayed. Defendant to file Stauffer appeal status report every year in February and within 30 days after mandate issues. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/31/2010. (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mudge v. Scotts Miracle-Gro Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Mudge
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?