Doe v. Freeburg Community Consolidated School District et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Freeburg Community Consolidated School District, Clarence Haege and Lawrence Meggs
Case Number: 3:2010cv00458
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/dka) dismissing case with prejudice, without costs.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/11/2012. (dka, )
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 102 MOTION to Bar Testimony of Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosed Witness. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/12/2012. (dka, )
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,the Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Wilkersons orders (Docs. 47, 64 & 92) as MODIFIED by the Courts December 16, 2011, rulings, OVERRULES the defendants objections (Docs. 48, 67 & 93) and VACATES the hearing on the objections currently set for June 14, 2012.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/8/2012. (jdh)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re In-Camera Review of Documents. Defendants shall produce documents consistent with this Order by 5/11/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/30/12. (alg)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re In-Camera Review of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/21/11. (alg)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re In-Camera Review of Documents Numbered FSD 2141-2142. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/2/11. (alg)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re Court's In-Camera Review of Closed Session Board Meeting Minutes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/23/11. (alg)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING 17 Motion for Entry of Agreed to Protective Order filed by John Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/27/10. (alg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Freeburg Community Consolidated School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: John Brian Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeburg Community Consolidated School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Haege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Meggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?