Fitts v. Gaetz
Defendant: Donald Gaetz
Petitioner: Dennis Fitts
Case Number: 3:2010cv00494
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 53 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Dennis Fitts; DENYING AS MOOT 52 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Dennis Fitts. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 5/22/2018. (ceh)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Dennis Fitts and FINDING AS MOOT 43 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Dennis Fitts. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 2/27/2018. (ceh)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/30/2013. (kbl)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/26/2013. (slj)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson; and Denying 3 MOTION to Proceed filed by Dennis Fitts. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/1/2010. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitts v. Gaetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Gaetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?