Waller v. Randle et al
Plaintiff: Henry L. Waller, Jr.
Defendant: Michael P Randle, Illinois Department of Corrections, Chad Parrish, Ken Bartley, Pat Quinn, Charles Roper, George Johnson, Patil, Vickie Fair, Yolande Johnson, Jason Hall, Lieutenant Ferguson and Monti
Case Number: 3:2010cv00495
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Presiding Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting defendants' Motions to Dismiss 25 , 38 , 59 . The Court dismissess all defendants except IDOC with prejudice. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at close of case. The Court dismisses Waller's Com plaint 1 without prejudice and grants Waller leave to file an amended complaint no later than July 15, 2011. The Court denies as moot IDOC's argument concerning alleged unavailability of pinitive damages. The Court denies as moot 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Patil and 68 Motion for Extension of Time except insofar as it relates to IDOC. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/31/2011. (dka, )
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER discharging 58 Order to Show Cause, deeming Waller's pro se Response 62 as timely. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/29/2010. (dka, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Waller show cause why the Court should not construe his failure to timely respond to defendants' dismissal motion 38 as an admission of its merits and grant the relief sought accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/4/2010. (dka, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 22 Motion to Reconsider, reversing Memorandum and Order 7 insofar as it denied Waller's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/26/2010. (dka, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense; denying 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying without prejudice 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Henry L. Waller, Jr. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/29/2010. (dka, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Randle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Waller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolande Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?