Openmind Solutions, Inc. v. Does 1-2925 Featured Case

Plaintiff: Openmind Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-2925
Amicus: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00092
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Regarding Proceeding as a Class Action. (Samuels, Julie)
April 25, 2011 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. Supplement to 30 Motion Hearing. (Steele, John)
April 19, 2011 Filing 31 Transcript of MOTIONS HEARING held on 4/11/2011, before Judge G. Patrick Murphy. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. This policy is located on our website at www.ilsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2011. (mnc)
April 11, 2011 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G. Patrick Murphy: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2011 re 20 MOTION to Quash filed by Nancy Waddell, 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Does 1-2925, 24 MOTION to Quash filed by Does 1-2925, 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion for Discovery. The parties are granted leave to file briefs re proceeding as a class action by 4/25/2011. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (lmm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julie P. Samuels on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slj) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julie P. Samuels by on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Fee paid, $100.00, receipt #34625025351) (Samuels, Julie) Modified on 4/11/2011 (slj).
April 3, 2011 Filing 27 OBJECTION to 26 Motion to Supplement, by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Steele, John)
April 1, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to Supplement AMICUS CURIAE THE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATIONS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND PETITION TO TEMPORARILY ENJOIN PLAINTIFF FROM SETTLING WITH DOE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE COURT HAS RESOLVED THE OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Mudd, Charles)
March 29, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on 24 MOTION to Quash, 23 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2011 at 02:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge G. Patrick Murphy. (lmm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 28, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Quash and/or Vacate Subpoena and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Does 1-2925. (jdh)
March 28, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Does 1-2925. Responses due by 5/2/2011. (jdh)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY: It is hereby ORDERED that all discovery in this case is STAYED pending resolution of 15 Motion to Reconsider Order on Motion on Discovery brought by Electronic Frontier Foundation ("EFF") as amicus curiae and 20 Motion to Quash Subpoena brought by Nancy Waddell. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Openmind Solutions, Inc. ("OS"), shall immediately cease to conduct discovery in this case, including issuance of subpoenas to the Internet service providers of members of the proposed class in this case and any other discovery in this case, until such time as EFF's motion and Mrs. Waddell's motion are resolved. Failure by OS or persons acting in concert with OS to comply with this Order shall be punishable by contempt. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/25/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on 20 MOTION to Quash: Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2011 at 02:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge G. Patrick Murphy. (lmm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on 15 MOTION for Reconsideration: Motion Hearing SET for 4/11/2011 at 02:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge G. Patrick Murphy. Electronic Frontier Foundation is invited to appear and to argue as a friend of the court amicus curiae.(lmm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 24, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Nancy Waddell. (myz)
March 23, 2011 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion for Discovery BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER GRANTING EARLY DISCOVERY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, OF QUASHING PLAINTIFFS PRE-COMP MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion for Discovery BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER GRANTING EARLY DISCOVERY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, OF QUASHING PLAINTIFFS PRE-COMP filed by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Steele, John)
March 23, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 16 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (lmt)
March 22, 2011 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to 12 Notice by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Steele, John) Modified on 3/23/2011 (lmt).
March 22, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion for Discovery BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER GRANTING EARLY DISCOVERY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, OF QUASHING PLAINTIFFS PRE-COMPLAINT SUBPOENAS by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed ISP Notice, # 2 Exhibit Schoen Declaration)(Mudd, Charles)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae brought by Electronic Frontier Foundation ("EFF"). EFF shall file its proposed brief amicus curiae not later than two (2) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/21/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 11 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. See attached document for specifics. (lmt)
March 15, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation AMICUS CURIAE THE ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Mudd, Charles)
March 15, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File The Electronic Frontier Foundation's Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit ISP Notice, # 3 Exhibit Schoen Declaration)(Mudd, Charles)
March 15, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Lee Mudd, Jr on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation (Mudd, Charles)
February 16, 2011 Filing 9 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (slj)
February 14, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE by Openmind Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment, # 2 Exhibit A)(Steele, John)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/10/11. (amv)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William D. Stiehl recused. Case reassigned to Judge G. Patrick Murphy for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 02/09/11. (jkb)
February 7, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Steele on behalf of Openmind Solutions, Inc. (Steele, John)
February 2, 2011 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery filed by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pfister Declaration)(Steele, John)
February 2, 2011 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Steele, John)
February 2, 2011 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Does 1-2925 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1325211.), filed by Openmind Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steele, John)
February 2, 2011 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 11-cv-00092-WDS-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge)(drb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Openmind Solutions, Inc. v. Does 1-2925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Openmind Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-2925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Charles Lee Mudd, Jr.
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?