Bowen v. Groome et al
Plaintiff: James Bowen
Defendant: William E. Groome and Vicki L. Groome
Case Number: 3:2011cv00139
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER on final fairness hearing and class settlement agreement. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 10/11/2013. (ktc)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion to Certify Class filed by James Bowen; CERTIFYING CLASS; APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE; APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 6/7/2012. (ktc)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Quash, construed as a Motion for Protective Order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). Plaintiff SHALL immediately provide a copy of the attached order to the subpoenaed third parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/17/2012. (jls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Groome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bowen
Represented By: A. Courtney Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Groome
Represented By: John P. Womick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki L. Groome
Represented By: John P. Womick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?