Cloverleaf Golf Course, Inc. v. FMC Corporation
Plaintiff: Cloverleaf Golf Course, Inc.
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00190
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/20/12. (skp)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying defendant's 39 MOTION to Stay. The Court defers ruling on defendant's 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Claim of Constitutionality and 17 MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/15/2011. (msdi)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/17/11. (anj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloverleaf Golf Course, Inc. v. FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Frederick J. Hess
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Zelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloverleaf Golf Course, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?