Byrd et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Giglio, Danielle Garner, Jamie Jeromin, Malissa Ward, Tamison Rife, Caylah Rojo, Barbara Broderson, Laura Currier, Lateycia Johnson, Valerie Sundberg, Leslie Scott, Marcella Crisan, Terry Enriquez, Skyla Smith, Rebecca Pastore, Betty Stevens, Cori Castro, Shelli Vinson, Janet McCarthy, Michelle Chavez, Maria Manahan, Shannon Lealos, Lillian Bookhill, Dawn Valencia, Ondria Gomez, Stephanie Lyghts, Jessica Gutierrez, Jessica Raya, Rachel Burgess, Valerie Schatz, Emily Mayer, Amalia Soliz, Nancy Paul, Susan Boring, Debra Moore, Marie Yee, Bilma Fernandez, Erica Cox, Kassandra Alvarez, Renee Manning, Elizabeth Michaud, Ahsley Gross, Crystal Johnston, Larissa Judson, Lea Slawson, Rochele Romano, Catherine Reed, Sabrina Indomenico, Christina Murray Myers, Jennifer Schmekel, Shelley Williams, Deadre Quiver, Natasha Macklin, Sonja Keys, Sherri Bazemore, Melissa Hawes, Melissa Jernigan, Mary Stanley, Audrey Adams, Leann Vanacker, Ashley Weber, April Stalvey, Wendy Rayburn, Victoria Robinson, Melanie Wallace, Tricia Kelley-Learman, Donna Bearden, Taylor Johnson, Christy White, Sarah Nelson, Stacy Darrow, Bonnie McGregor, Andrea Deely, Kiri Miranda, Keshsa Eubanks, Shelattae Whitaker, Estella Ross, Terri Sellers, Lacy Bailey, Desiree Casto-Cheatham, Elizabeth Bailey-Smith, June Robles, Kristen Ozinga, Kimberly Byrd, Toni Thomas, Kelly Blankenship, Tamela McWhorter, Melissa Mosely, Jessica Kimmel-Freeman, Danette Stump, Keshia Matthews, Nakia Hardy and Raven Roberson
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc and Bayer Pharma AG
Petitioner: Alicia Leigeber
Case Number: 3:2011cv12890
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 29 MOTION to Vacate 5 Order on Motion to Dismiss as to Certain Plaintiffs. 5 Order on Motion to Dismiss is hereby VACATED as to the following plaintiffs: 1.Cori Castro, 2.Terry Enriquez, 3.Melissa Hawes, 4.Bonnie Mc Gregor, 5.Kiri Miranda, 6.Nancy Paul, 7.Terri Sellers, and 8.Mary Stanley. FURTHER THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO REINSTATE THE CLAIMS OF THE SAME. FURTHER, 26 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice and 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/20/2013. (dsw)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate. As to certain plaintiffs, movant seeks to vacate the order of dismissal entered for failure to comply with PFS obligations 5 . Bayer has not responded. Accordingly, the Court hereby vacates the order of dismis sal 5 as to the following plaintiffs and directs the Clerk of the Court to reinstate the same: Lacy Bailey, ElizabethBailey-Smith, Barbara Brodersen, Shelli Daniels Vinson, Danielle Garner, AshleyGross, Jamie Jeromin, Tricia Kelly-Learman, Maria Manahan, Emily Mayer,Kristen Ozinga, Valerie Schatz, Amalia Soliz, Shannon Lealos, Melanie Wallace,and Malissa Ward. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/4/2012. (dsw)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate as to Crystal Johnston only is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall reinstate Crystal Johnston. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/10/2012. (dsw)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. The order of dismissal for failure to comply with PFS obligations applies to the following plaintiffs: (1) Kassandra Alvarez, (2) Lacy Bailey, (3) Elizabeth Bailey-Smith, (4) Sherri Bazemore, (5) Donna Bearden, (6) Kelly Blankenship, (7) Barbara Broderson, (8) Rachel Burgess, (9) Kimberly Byrd, (10) Cori Castro, (11) Desiree Castro-Cheatham, (12) Erica Cox, (13) Laura Currier, (14) Terry Enriquez, (15) Bilma Fernandez, (16) Danielle Garner, (17) Jennifer Gi glio, (18) Ashley Gross, (19) Jessica Gutierrez, (20) Melissa Hawes, (21) Jamie Jeromin, (22) Lateycia Johnson, (23) Crystal Johnston, (24) Tricia Kelley-Learman, (25) Sonja Keys, (26) Shannon Lealos, (27) Stephanie Lyghts, (28) Natasha Macklin, (29) Maria Manahan, (30) Renee Manning, (31) Keshia Matthews, (32) Emily Mayer, (33) Janet McCarthy, (34) Bonnie McGregor, (35) Kiri Miranda, (36) Christina Murray-Myers, (37) Kristen Ozinga, (38) Nancy Paul, (39) Jessica Raya, (40) June Robles, (41) Val erie Schatz, (42) Jennifer Schmekel, (43) Terri Sellers, (44) Lea Slawson, (45) Amalia Soliz, (46) Mary Stanley, (47) Betty Stevens, (48) Toni Thomas, (49) Shelli Vinson, (50) Melanie Wallace, (51) Malissa Ward, (52) Ashley Weber, and (53) Shelettae Whitaker.. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/1/2012. (dsw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Giglio
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Garner
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Jeromin
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Ward
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamison Rife
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caylah Rojo
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Broderson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Currier
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateycia Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sundberg
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Scott
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Crisan
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Enriquez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyla Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Pastore
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Stevens
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cori Castro
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelli Vinson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet McCarthy
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Chavez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Manahan
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lealos
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Bookhill
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Valencia
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ondria Gomez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lyghts
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Gutierrez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Raya
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Burgess
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Schatz
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Mayer
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Soliz
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Paul
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Boring
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Moore
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Yee
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilma Fernandez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Cox
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassandra Alvarez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Manning
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Michaud
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahsley Gross
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Johnston
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Judson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Slawson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochele Romano
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Reed
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Indomenico
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Murray Myers
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Schmekel
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Williams
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deadre Quiver
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Macklin
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Keys
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Bazemore
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hawes
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jernigan
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stanley
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Adams
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Vanacker
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Weber
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Stalvey
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rayburn
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Robinson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Wallace
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Kelley-Learman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bearden
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy White
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Nelson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Darrow
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie McGregor
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Deely
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiri Miranda
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshsa Eubanks
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelattae Whitaker
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Ross
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Sellers
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Bailey
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Casto-Cheatham
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bailey-Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Robles
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Ozinga
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Byrd
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Thomas
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Blankenship
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamela McWhorter
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mosely
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kimmel-Freeman
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette Stump
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshia Matthews
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia Hardy
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Roberson
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John E. Galvin
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alicia Leigeber
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?