OneBeacon America Insurance Company v. City of Granite City et al
Plaintiff: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Defendant: City of Granite City and David Funkhouser
Case Number: 3:2012cv00156
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A RULE 58 JUDGMENT. Vacating and Replacing 19 Clerk's Judgment of 2/14/2013. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/19/2013. (kar)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/14/2013. (slj)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, GRANTING 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OneBeacon America Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/13/2013. (kar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneBeacon America Insurance Company v. City of Granite City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: William W. Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Granite City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Funkhouser
Represented By: Steven L. Groves
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Represented By: Steven J. Stolze
Represented By: Kevin D. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?