Boyd et al v. Godinez et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Boyd, Paul Lee and Kendrick Pearson |
Defendant: |
S.A. Godinez and Randy Davis |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00704 |
Filed: |
June 13, 2012 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Phil Gilbert |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 7, 2017 |
Filing
127
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court ADOPTS in its entirety Magistrate Judge Daly's Report and Recommendations (Doc. 126 ) and GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for voluntary dismissal (Doc. 114 ). All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. As no claims remain pending, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/7/2017. (rah)
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Class Certification for Purposes of Settlement (Doc. 33 . The Court CERTIFIES the following class for settlement purposes only and APPOINTS plaintiff J.B. Washup as class representative; and APPOINTS attorneys Mark Mester and Kathleen Lally, of Latham & Watkins LLP, and Alan Mills, of Uptown Peoples Law Center, as class counsel. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/31/2013. (jdh)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Granting 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Boyd, Kendrick Pearson, Paul Lee. The Court reserves the ruling on the motion for class certification. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/29/2013. (jdh)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: class certification. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2013. (jdh)
|
August 30, 2013 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Granting 40 Amended MOTION to Seal Amended Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Michael Boyd, Kendrick Pearson, Paul Lee, and renders as moot 35 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Document 34 Exhibits 7, 12, 14-17, 19-20, 23-24, 26-29, and 31) filed by Michael Boyd, Kendrick Pearson, Paul Lee. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/30/2013. (jdh)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, Denying 8 MOTION - Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Review Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act filed by Michael Boyd, Kendrick Pearson, Paul Lee. The threshold review of the c omplaint having now been completed, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to serve Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4. Defendants are ORDERED to timely file an appropriate responsive pleading to the complaint and shall not waive filing a reply pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/28/2012. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?