JBS Carriers, Inc. v. EJA Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: JBS Carriers, Inc.
Defendant: EJA Trucking, Inc. and Edin Karahodzic
Case Number: 3:2012cv01040
Filed: September 27, 2012
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/2/16. (lmp)
October 18, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Edin Karahodzic against JBS Carriers, Inc.. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/18/16. (cekf)
April 7, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 143 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Orenthio Thompson, JBS Carriers, Inc. Jury Trial reset for 8/29/2016 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David R. Herndon. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 4/7/16. (lmp)
November 5, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 124 Motion in Limine. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/5/15. (lmp)
October 19, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying 110 MOTION in Limine to exclude reference to any alleged Federal motor Carrier Safety Regulation Violations by Hasib Karahodzic or EJA Trucking prior to or in connection with the March 17, 2012 Collision filed by Edin Kara hodzic, granting 112 MOTION in Limine to exclude any reference to any alleged federal motor carrier safety regulation violations by Edin Karahodzic prior to or on March 17, 2012 filed by Edin Karahodzic,denying 114 MOTION in Limine to exclude reference to any party's (including Hasib Karahozic's) religious affiliation filed by Edin Karahodzic, denying 116 MOTION in Limine to exclude any evidence of Hasib Karahodzic's alleged fatigue being similar to the same as having any level of Blood Alcohol Concentration filed by Edin Karahodzic, denying 118 MOTION in Limine to exclude reference to any information, refernce to, ordocumentation of John Gobelbecker's Night Time Video Stud y filed by Edin Karahodzic, denying 120 MOTION in Limine to exclude reference to any information, reference to, or documentation of Dan Witta's Lane Change Study used in John Gobelbecker's Report filed by Edin Karahodzic, denying 122 MOTION in Limine to exclude any information, reference to, or documentation of faigue filed by Edin Karahodzic. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/19/15. (lmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBS Carriers, Inc. v. EJA Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBS Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: John S. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJA Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edin Karahodzic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?