B.P. v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: B.P.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00324
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING case to Chief Judge Herndon as presiding judge. Final Pretrial Conference and argument on all motions set for 5/1/2014 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/28/2014. (mtm)
December 16, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 12/16/2013 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/16/2013. (anj)
October 28, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding discovery dispute held on 10/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/28/2013. (anj)
April 23, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/23/13. (amv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.P. v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Kathleen B. Barry
Represented By: Peter W. Herzog, III
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Michael B. MacWilliams
Represented By: Stefan Mallen
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jason C. Rose
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Represented By: Paul F. Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.P.
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: George Erick Rosemond
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Kathryn Harrington
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: John E. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?