Slayton v. Feralloy Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Elvis Slayton
Defendant: Feralloy Corporation and International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 688
Case Number: 3:2013cv00424
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice.Approved by Judge David R. Herndon on 4/7/16. (cekf)
March 8, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER( Responses due by 5/12/2016). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/7/16. (cekf)
July 28, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. At the close of the case, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment in favor of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 688 and against Elvis Slayton. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/28/15. (klh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slayton v. Feralloy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Slayton
Represented By: John H. Leskera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feralloy Corporation
Represented By: Heidi K. Durr
Represented By: Burton D. Garland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 688
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?