Banks v. Kale et al
Plaintiff: Robert Ross Banks
Defendant: Preston Humphrey and Alok Kale
Case Number: 3:2013cv00559
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STRICKEN PER DOC#26-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.( Show Cause Response due by 8/8/2014.) Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/10/2014. (jdh) Modified on 7/10/2014 (jdh).
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/bkl) Case is dismissed.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/7/13. (bkl)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Court ORDERS that Banks file a supplement to his complaint explaining the facts that gave rise to the violations alleged in the complaint. The court RESERVES RULING on Banks pending motion (Doc. 3). If Banks is unable to tell the Court the facts on which his claims are based, the Court may dismiss this action for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/17/2013. (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Kale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alok Kale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ross Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?