Beasley v. Godinez et al
Plaintiff: Larry Beasley
Defendant: Salvador Godinez, John/Jane Doe, John Doe #1, John Doe #2 and #3 and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2013cv00625
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ADOPTING 96 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 69 Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/6/15. (klh2)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Larry Beasley, and, DENYING 31 MOTION to get defendants named filed by Larry Beasley. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint, submitted on August 4, 2014, as his First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants SANDRA FUNK, MICHAEL PYATT, and KIM SEIDAL: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/19/2014. (nms)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY STRICKEN: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each named Plaintiff (other than Plaintiff Bean) shall advise the Court in writing on or before July 3, 2014, whether he wishes to continue as a Plaintiff in this group action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to se nd a copy of this order to each of the named Plaintiffs, and to enclose a blank form IFP Motion and trust fund account certification form with each order. (Action due by 7/3/2014). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/13/2014. (tjk) Modified on 6/13/2014 (tjk).
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. All substantive claims against Defendant SALVADOR GODINEZ (Count 1) are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. GODINEZ shall remain as a defendant in this action for purposes of injunctive relief. COUNTS 1-4 state colorable Eighth Amendment claims against all Defendants, with the exception of SALVADOR GODINEZ, and shall proceed.The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant SALVADOR GODINEZ: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 11/14/2013. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Godinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2 and #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?