Lamon v. Schuler et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Lamon
Defendant: Harold Schuler
Case Number: 3:2013cv01129
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 113 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 112 Motion for Sanctions. Lamon's IFP status is REVOKED and he is ORDERED to pay $949.19, the remaining balance of his filing fee for all three cases. These consolidated cases (Case No. 13-cv-1129, Case No. 14-cv-1051, Case No. 15-cv-945) are DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/10/2016. (bak)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 78 ) for Sanctions is DENIED. The Court DIRECTS the defendants to file the Motion for Summary within seven (7) days of this order or inform the Court that they no longer desire to proceed with the motion. If the summary judgment motion is filed, Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty (30) days from the filing of the motion for summary judgment to submit a response. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Relief (Doc. 79 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/29/2016. (jdh)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court APOPTS the Report and Recommendation (R & R)(Doc. 68 ) of Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier and Plaintiffs Motions for Sanctions and Hearing (Docs. 56 , 60 , 66 and part of 65 with regard to sanctions) are DENI ED. Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw Complaint against Defendant Harold Schuler (part of Doc. 65 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Harold Schuler is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly at the completion of this matter. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/8/2015. (jdh)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, for the purposes of discovery and trial, the Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Lamon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-1129-JPG-PMF) with Lamon v. Stephens, (Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF) and Lamon v. Kerr, (Case Number 15-cv-00945-JPG -PMF). All future filing shall bear the consolidated caption used in this order and shall be filed only in Lamon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-1129-JPG-PMF). The Court will strike any filings in Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF and 15-cv-00945-JPG-PMF subsequent to this order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CONSOLIDATE these cases and to file a copy of this Order all three cases. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/16/2015. (jdh)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 50 ) and DENIES Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 37 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/10/2015. (jdh)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER consolidating cases. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/23/2015. (jdh)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew Lamon. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claim for deliberate indifference to his medical need for a soy-f ree diet (COUNT 2) is SEVERED into a new case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant DAVID is TERMINATED from this action with prejudice. As to COUNT 1, which remains in the instant case, the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant SCHULER: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). (Action due by 1/16/2014). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/2/2013. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamon v. Schuler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?