Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: Harmon V. Cook, Jr., Pamela A Cook, Willow Creek II Homeowners Association and Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Case Number: 3:2014cv00107
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/18/2016. (jdh)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 48 MOTION to Sever filed by Green Tree Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/26/2015. (jdh)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pamela A Cook, Harmon V. Cook, Jr. and 28 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Filing in the Circuit Court of Madison County & For Attorney's Fees Under 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Pamela A Cook, Harmon V. Cook, Jr. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/12/15. (jdh)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court hereby ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 32 ) and DENIES Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 11 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/25/2014. (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Mil Reyes Weininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon V. Cook, Jr.
Represented By: Richard L Steagall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A Cook
Represented By: Richard L Steagall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Creek II Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?