Burns v. AERCO International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Burns
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Carbonline Company, General Cable Industries, Inc., Goulds Pumps Inc, Brand Insulations, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Resco Holdings, LLC., Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Duro Dyne Corporation, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, McCord Gasket Company, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Shell Chemical Company, Dezurik, Viking Pump Inc, Mack Trucks, Inc., Crane Company, Beazer East, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, MW Custom Papers, LLC, The Coleman Company, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Nash Engineering Company, Ferro Engineering, Compudyne Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Sepco Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, ECR International Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, Treco Construction Services, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., AERCO International, Inc., Stewart Warner Corporation, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Imo Industries, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Rohm & Haas Co., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Rohm and Haas Company, Carrier Corporation, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Burnham, LLC, Johnson Controls, Inc., Whiting Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., KCG Inc., American Optical Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Henry Pratt Company, Shell Oil Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Peerless Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Daniel International Corporation, Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Lattner Boiler Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Nibco, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Young Group, Ltd., ITT Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, The Fairbanks Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Bechtel Construction Company, API Heat Transfer, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., XEF, Inc., Navistar International, Riley Stoker Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Oakfabco, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Foxboro Company, Cummins, Inc., Motion Control Industries, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Wm. Powell Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Deere & Company, Pratt & Whitney Company, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Paccar, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Pecora Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Bird Incorporated, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Flowserve Corporation, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., Hyster Company, Goodyear Canada. Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Rogers Corporation, Buffalo Air Handling, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Universal Refractories, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Watson McDaniel Company, Nooter Corporation, Boeing Company, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Sherwin-Williams Company, Clow Corporation, York International Corporation, Greene Tweed & Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Dap, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, Clark Equipment Company, Velan Valve Corporation, Curtiss Wright Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc, Dravo Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Richards Industries, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, McNally Industries, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Joy Technologies, Inc., General Electric Company, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Phillips 66 Company, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, AWC 1997 Corporation, BP Products North America, Inc., RIC-WIL, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Foseco, Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Maremont Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Inc., CBS Corporation, Weil McLain, Ford Motor Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, Pfizer Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, BW/IP, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Chicago Gasket Company, Homasote Company, Johnston Boiler Company, Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Harper International Corp., Lindberg, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. and Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00232
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2014 Filing 870 Letter from Madison County Circuit Clerk acknowledging Order of Remand. (jlrr )
August 27, 2014 Filing 869 Letter remanding case sent to Madison County State Court. (trb)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear case number 14-cv-232-SMY/DGW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 08/21/2014. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2014 Filing 867 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver Brooks (Griebel, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER GRANTING #224 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/22/14. (sgp)
August 15, 2014 Filing 865 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Amendment to #421 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Stevens, Kyler)
August 8, 2014 Filing 864 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of York International Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 863 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 862 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 861 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 860 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 859 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Foxboro Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 8, 2014 Filing 858 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 4, 2014 Filing 857 RESPONSE in Opposition re #804 MOTION to Dismiss Oakfabco, Inc. filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
July 15, 2014 Filing 856 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nooter Corporation. (Nieder, Douglas)
July 14, 2014 Filing 855 Transcript of MOTIONS held on 6/13/2014, before Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014. (mnc)
July 14, 2014 Filing 854 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 853 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
July 14, 2014 Filing 852 RESPONSE in Opposition re #640 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) General Electric Company filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 851 RESPONSE in Opposition re #839 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 850 RESPONSE in Opposition re #841 MOTION for More Definite Statement Illinois Tool Works, Inc. filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
July 9, 2014 Filing 849 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #843 Notice of Appearance filed by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
July 8, 2014 Filing 848 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santa Fe Braun, Inc.(individually and as successor to C.F. Braun & Co.). (Tayyab, Julia)
July 7, 2014 Filing 847 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holdings, Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 846 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries, Inc.. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 845 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 844 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McCord Gasket Company identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for McCord Gasket Company. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 843 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Santa Fe Braun, Inc.(individually and as successor to C.F. Braun & Co.) (Tayyab, Julia)
July 7, 2014 Filing 842 ANSWER to Complaint by Research-Cottrell, Inc..(Page, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 841 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Geraci, Carl)
July 7, 2014 Filing 840 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Research-Cottrell, Inc.. (Page, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 839 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
July 7, 2014 Filing 838 MOTION For Leave to File Responsive Pleadings, instanter (Unopposed) by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Morris, H.)
July 7, 2014 Filing 837 ANSWER to Complaint by Swindell-Dressler International Company.(Hays, Keith)
July 7, 2014 Filing 836 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Hays on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Company (Hays, Keith)
July 7, 2014 Filing 835 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Patrick Morris on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Morris, H.)
July 7, 2014 Filing 834 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Page, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 833 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc.(as successor in interest to Northern Pump Company), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 832 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
July 7, 2014 Filing 831 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #825 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nooter Corporation. Proposed pleading e-filed with document when it should be e-mailed. Please refer to Section 2.0: pages 2.6 & 2.7 of the User's Manual. Document to be forwar4ded via e-mail to the appropriate Judge. E-mail addresses are located in the User's Manual.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 7, 2014 Filing 830 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sherwin Williams Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bruegger, John)
July 7, 2014 Filing 829 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of McCord Gasket Company (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 3, 2014 Filing 828 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #814 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Peerless Industries, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
July 3, 2014 Filing 827 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #813 Answer to Complaint filed by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
July 3, 2014 Filing 826 Defendant Nooter Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
July 3, 2014 Filing 825 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nooter Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nieder, Douglas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 824 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nieder on behalf of Nooter Corporation (Nieder, Douglas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 823 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 822 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 821 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 820 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 819 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K. Velez on behalf of Special Electric Company, Inc. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 818 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 817 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 816 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 815 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 814 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 828 - MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Peerless Industries, Inc., MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 7/3/2014 (bkl).
July 2, 2014 Filing 813 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 827. - Entry of Appearance ANSWER to Complaint Entry of Appearance by Santa Fe Braun, Inc.(individually and as successor to C.F. Braun & Co.).(Tayyab, Julia) Modified on 7/3/2014 (bkl).
July 2, 2014 Filing 812 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Peerless Industries, Inc. (Alva, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 811 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Henry Pratt Company (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Filing 810 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER re Stipulations of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/2/14. (sgp)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER re #706 Scheduling Order: Paragraph C(1) of the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Any party properly served SHALL file a responsive pleading by June 23, 2014. Plaintiff shall seek entry of default by July 14, 2014 as to any party who has failed to file a responsive pleading. Failure to seek default by the deadline may result in dismissal, without prejudice, of that Defendant for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/1/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 1, 2014 Filing 807 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Kern Oertle on behalf of Deere & Company (Oertle, Heidi)
June 30, 2014 Filing 806 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 805 MEMORANDUM in Support re #804 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 804 MOTION to Dismiss by Oakfabco, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Ward, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 803 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 802 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Ward on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Ward, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 801 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Cowan, Tracy)
June 27, 2014 Filing 800 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brummond on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Brummond, Robert)
June 25, 2014 Filing 799 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #783 Answer to Complaint filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. Document is captioned with inconsistent case information and therefore it is undetermined if filed in the appropriate case. No action required by the filer as documents have been re-filed in both cases.(cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2014 Filing 798 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #772 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc., #777 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Resco Holdings, LLC.. See attached document for specifics (cjo)
June 25, 2014 Filing 797 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #769 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. and #770 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. Documents are filed as duplicate and triplicate of document #767 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2014 Filing 796 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bruegger on behalf of Sherwin Williams Company, The (Bruegger, John)
June 25, 2014 Filing 795 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #791 Notice of Appearance. See attached document for specifics (kek)
June 24, 2014 Filing 794 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Responsive Pleadings by Sherwin Williams Company, The. (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 793 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sherwin Williams Company, The. (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 792 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Sherwin Williams Company, The (Cowan, Tracy)
June 24, 2014 Filing 791 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 795 - NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bruegger on behalf of All Defendants (Bruegger, John) Modified on 6/25/2014 (kek).
June 24, 2014 Filing 790 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Hipskind on behalf of Maremont Corporation (Hipskind, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 789 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
June 24, 2014 Filing 788 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Resco Holdings, LLC. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
June 24, 2014 Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
June 24, 2014 Filing 786 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Resco Holdings, LLC. (Orris, Thomas)
June 23, 2014 Filing 785 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Occidental Chemical Corporation(individually and as successor in interst to Durez Corporation).(Zellmer, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 784 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pharmacia Corporation.(Ault, Jordan)
June 23, 2014 Filing 783 STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Occidental Chemical Corporation(individually and as successor in interst to Durez Corporation).(Zellmer, Mark) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cjo).
June 23, 2014 Filing 782 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Deere & Company (Casmere, Edward)
June 23, 2014 Filing 781 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Deere & Company (Fischer, Matthew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 780 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Resco Holdings, LLC..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 779 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Deere & Company (Watson, Brian)
June 23, 2014 Filing 778 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resco Holdings, LLC.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 777 STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Initial Disclosure by Resco Holdings, LLC..(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cjo).
June 23, 2014 Filing 776 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company. (Reust, Davin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 775 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Resco Holdings, LLC. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 774 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 773 ANSWER to Complaint and All Current and Anticipated Cross-Claims and Counterclaims by Deere & Company.(Reust, Davin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 772 STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Initial Disclosure by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cjo).
June 23, 2014 Filing 771 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 770 STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cjo).
June 23, 2014 Filing 769 STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cjo).
June 23, 2014 Filing 768 NOTICE of Appearance by Davin Maitland Reust on behalf of Deere & Company (Reust, Davin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 767 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 766 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. O'Malley on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 765 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 764 RESPONSE to #608 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company). (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 763 RESPONSE to #641 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by General Cable Industries, Inc.. (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 762 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Goulds Pumps Inc, Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 761 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
June 23, 2014 Filing 760 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Jagadich on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Jagadich, Adam)
June 20, 2014 Filing 759 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Pozan, Kyle)
June 20, 2014 Filing 758 ANSWER to Crossclaim (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Answer to All Cross-Claims) by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
June 20, 2014 Filing 757 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howden North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Howden North America, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 Filing 756 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Inc identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 Filing 755 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 Filing 754 STIPULATION of Dismissal Crane Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion to Withdraw; GRANTING #134 Motion for Joinder; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #224 Motion to Remand. MOOTING #66 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #107 Motion; #199 Motion; #453 Motion. MOOTING #131 Motion for More Definite Statement; #138 Motion for More Definite Statement; #468 Motion for More Definite Statement. TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #439 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; #473 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. MOOTING #640 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/20/14. (sgp)
June 20, 2014 Filing 752 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #732 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Michael Burns. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
June 20, 2014 Filing 751 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 20, 2014 Filing 750 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Pratt & Whitney Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 20, 2014 Filing 749 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Clark Equipment Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 748 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Clark Equipment Company (Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 747 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Cummins, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 746 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 745 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Paccar, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 744 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Paccar, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 743 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 742 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 741 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 740 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 739 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 738 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Group, LTD by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 737 STIPULATION of Dismissal Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 736 STIPULATION of Dismissal Valero Energy Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 735 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 734 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #704 Notice of Appearance filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc., #702 Notice of Appearance filed by Navistar International. Documents are duplicates of 701 and 703. Per telephone call with attorneys office, I advised them that a separate Notice of Appearance was to be signed and filed by Attorney Allison Sonneveld so that she may be added to the case(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 19, 2014 Filing 733 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Roebuck & Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 732 STIPULATION of Dismissal Richards Industries by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 731 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paccar, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 730 STIPULATION of Dismissal Northrop Grumman Systems Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 729 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nibco, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 728 STIPULATION of Dismissal Motion Control Industries, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 727 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelsey-Hayes Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 726 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Paint Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 725 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 724 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 723 STIPULATION of Dismissal Goodyear Canada, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 722 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duroy Dyne Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 721 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cummins, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 720 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 719 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Gasket by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 718 RESPONSE to #602 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 717 STIPULATION of Dismissal American Optical Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 716 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 715 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 714 STIPULATION of Dismissal Aerco International by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 713 STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 712 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 710 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 19, 2014 Filing 709 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 19, 2014 Filing 708 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 707 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #688 Stipulation of Dismissal filed #685 #674 #683 #669 #686 #678 #672 #681 #680 #689 #673 #668 #675 #692 #687 #677 #670 #682 , #690 , #671 , #691 , #679 , #676 #693 Efiler attached the Proposed Order to the Stipulations of Dismissal. Proposed documents are not to be efiled, but emailed to the appropriate Judge. Efiler is instructed to email the Proposed Order to the appropriate Judge for review and approval. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 706 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/17/14. (sgp)
June 17, 2014 Filing 705 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Goulds Pumps Inc, Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 17, 2014 Filing 704 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis) Modified on 6/19/2014 (jaj).
June 17, 2014 Filing 703 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 702 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis) Modified on 6/19/2014 (jaj).
June 17, 2014 Filing 701 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 700 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 699 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 698 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 697 Howden North America, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Howden North America, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 696 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 695 Conwed Corporation ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 694 Burnham, LLC ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 693 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Insulation Group of St. Louis by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 692 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Group, LTD by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 691 STIPULATION of Dismissal Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 690 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 689 STIPULATION of Dismissal Valero Energy Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 688 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Roebuck & Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 687 STIPULATION of Dismissal Richards Industries by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 686 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paccar Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 685 STIPULATION of Dismissal Northrop Grumman Systems Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 684 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014 re #7 #66 #107 #131 #134 #138 #199 #224 #439 #453 #468 #473 #640 (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.). Attorneys present: Jordan Ault, Laura Beasley, Tucker Blaser, Bradley R. Bultman, Michael Dauphin, Kevin Dawson, Sean P. Fergus, Margaret Foster, Carl J. Geraci, Keith B. Hill, Brian Huelsmann, Will Irwin, Melanie King, Michael McGinley, Julie Fix Meyer, David Page, Allyson Romani, Gary L. Smith, William B. Starnes, Ross Titzer, Jerome S. Warchol, Jr., Benjamin Wilson, Mark G. Zellmer. Order on Motions and Scheduling Order to issue. If an attorney was present but does not appear on the above list, he/she to contact chambers by June 18, 2014. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2014 Filing 683 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nibco, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 682 STIPULATION of Dismissal Motion Control Industries, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 681 STIPULATION of Dismissal McCord Gasket Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 680 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelsey-Hayes Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 679 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Paint Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 678 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kaiser Gypsum Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 677 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 676 STIPULATION of Dismissal Goodyear Canada, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 675 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 674 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cummins, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 673 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 672 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Gasket Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 671 STIPULATION of Dismissal American Optical Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 670 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 669 STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 668 STIPULATION of Dismissal Aerco International, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 667 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Howden North America, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Navistar International.(Jones, Kirra)
June 16, 2014 Filing 666 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Howden North America, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Kvaerner U.S., Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 16, 2014 Filing 665 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Howden North America, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 16, 2014 Filing 664 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 16, 2014 Filing 663 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 662 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Goulds Pumps Inc (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 661 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Copes Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 660 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 659 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Dawson, Kevin)
June 13, 2014 Filing 658 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Goulds Pumps Inc, Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 13, 2014 Filing 657 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company (Bultman, Bradley)
June 12, 2014 Filing 656 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Motion Control Industries, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Beazer East, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 654 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 653 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 652 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #590 Notice (Other) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Document stricken pursuant to request from chambers. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 12, 2014 Filing 651 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 649 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Pratt & Whitney Company (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 648 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 647 RESPONSE in Opposition re #473 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) Rohm & Haas Company filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 646 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Copes Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 12, 2014 Filing 645 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Beasley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Beasley, Laura)
June 12, 2014 Filing 644 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
June 12, 2014 Filing 643 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 642 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Coleman Company, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 641 STIPULATION of Dismissal General Cable Industries, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 640 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by General Electric Company. Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Fournie, Raymond)
June 11, 2014 Filing 639 STIPULATION of Dismissal Avocet Enterprises, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 638 STIPULATION of Dismissal AWC 1997 Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 637 STIPULATION of Dismissal XEF, Inc., f/k/a Electric Furnace Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 636 STIPULATION of Dismissal Whiting Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 635 STIPULATION of Dismissal Universal Refractories, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 634 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermwell Products Co., Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 633 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stewart Warner Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 631 STIPULATION of Dismissal Seco Warwick Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 630 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 629 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rockwell Automation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rheem Manufacturing Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 627 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pratt & Whitney Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 626 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plastics Engineering Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 625 STIPULATION of Dismissal Milwaukee Valve Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 624 STIPULATION of Dismissal Metallo Gasket Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 623 STIPULATION of Dismissal McMaster Carr Supply Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 622 STIPULATION of Dismissal Mack Trucks, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 621 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lindberg by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 620 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 619 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lattner Boiler Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 618 MEMORANDUM in Support re #439 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC. (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 10, 2014 Filing 617 STIPULATION of Dismissal KGC, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 616 STIPULATION of Dismissal Johnston Boiler Co. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 615 STIPULATION of Dismissal Johnson Controls, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 614 STIPULATION of Dismissal Honeywell Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 613 STIPULATION of Dismissal Homasote Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 612 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harco Laboratories, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 611 STIPULATION of Dismissal Graybar Electric Company, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 610 STIPULATION of Dismissal Foseco, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 609 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ford Motor Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 608 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ferro Engineering by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 607 STIPULATION of Dismissal ECR International, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 606 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dravo Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 605 STIPULATION of Dismissal Domco Products Texas, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 604 STIPULATION of Dismissal Curtiss Wright Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 603 STIPULATION of Dismissal Compudyne Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 602 STIPULATION of Dismissal Columbia Boiler Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 601 STIPULATION of Dismissal Clow Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 600 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 599 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Boeing Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 598 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bird Incorporated by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 597 STIPULATION of Dismissal Baltimore Aircoil Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 596 STIPULATION of Dismissal API Heat Transfer, Inc. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 595 STIPULATION of Dismissal A.O. Smith Corporation by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 594 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ajax Magnethermic Corp. by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 593 STIPULATION of Dismissal Carboline Company by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 592 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Cable Industries, Inc..(Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 591 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Bronsky, A.)
June 9, 2014 Filing 590 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Joint Report of the Partiesand Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed order)(Sampson, Mark) Modified on 6/12/2014 (lmb).
June 9, 2014 Filing 589 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Inc identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 9, 2014 Filing 588 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Goulds Pumps Inc.(Graber, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 Filing 587 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corporation. (Ault, Jordan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 586 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan T. Ault on behalf of Pharmacia Corporation (Ault, Jordan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 585 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 584 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navistar International identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation for Navistar International. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 583 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kvaerner U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kvaerner Holdings, Inc. for Kvaerner U.S., Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 582 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 581 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Navistar International (Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 579 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 578 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 577 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Navistar International (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 5, 2014 Filing 574 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 3, 2014 Filing 573 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes Vulcan. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified on 6/3/2014 (tkm ).
June 3, 2014 Filing 572 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #563 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Copes Vulcan. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
June 2, 2014 Filing 571 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 570 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 569 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of ECR International Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 568 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Filing 567 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 566 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Zellmer, Mark)
May 30, 2014 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Zellmer, Mark)
May 30, 2014 Filing 564 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copes Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 563 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 572 - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes Vulcan. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified on 6/3/2014 (anm).
May 29, 2014 Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 561 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 28, 2014 Filing 560 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company) identifying Corporate Parent Oglebay Norton Company for Ferro Engineering. (Bronsky, A.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 559 RESPONSE in Opposition re #439 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MW Custom Papers, LLC filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
May 27, 2014 Filing 558 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Coleman Company, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 556 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Goulds Pumps Inc (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Graber, Dennis)
May 23, 2014 Filing 553 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watson McDaniel Company. (Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 552 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 551 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker Blaser on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Cunningham on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Cunningham, John)
May 23, 2014 Filing 549 ANSWER to Complaint cross-claims against all defendants and answer to all cross-claims by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company).(Bronsky, A.)
May 21, 2014 Filing 548 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings for Cleaver Brooks. (Hudgens, Meredith)
May 21, 2014 Filing 547 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith S Hudgens on behalf of Cleaver Brooks (Hudgens, Meredith)
May 21, 2014 Filing 546 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2014 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Copes Vulcan (McGrath, Daniel)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #500 Motion to Vacate ; GRANTING IN PART #505 Motion to Vacate ; GRANTING IN PART #509 Motion to Vacate ; GRANTING IN PART #513 Motion to Vacate ; GRANTING IN PART #517 Motion to Vacate ; GRANTING IN PART #536 Motion to Vacate. No entries of Default or Default Judgment have been entered in this matter. Therefore, to the extent that these motions seek vacation of non-existent judgments, they are moot. However, the Motions are granted to the extent the filing Defendants seek to have their responsive pleadings filed in state court deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/20/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2014 Filing 543 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. (McGinley, Michael)
May 20, 2014 Filing 542 McMaster-Carr Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by McMaster-Carr Supply Company.(McGinley, Michael)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER GRANTING #483 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendnant Daniel International Corporation responsive pleading deemed timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/20/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER GRANTING #479 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING #480 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING #481 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING #482 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fluor Corporation's, Fluor Enterprises, Inc.'s, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.'s, and Fluor Constructors International, Inc.'s responsive pleadings deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/20/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2014 Filing 539 NOTICE of Hearing regarding schedule and on Motion #473 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), #439 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #138 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #224 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Withdraw #2 Notice of Removal, , #453 MOTION To Have All Counterclaims Deemed Filed And Answered Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion To Continue Deadlines To Answer And File Counterclaims , #199 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) , #131 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Quash Service of Process, #134 MOTION for Joinder in Co-Defendant Drane Co's Notice of Removal, #107 MOTION for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B), #468 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (sgp)
May 20, 2014 Filing 538 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of The Coleman Company, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
May 20, 2014 Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of The Coleman Company, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
May 20, 2014 Filing 536 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to file its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross Claims and Answers to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand by The Coleman Company, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
May 20, 2014 Filing 535 Defendant The Coleman Company, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answer to All Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by The Coleman Company, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
May 20, 2014 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of The Coleman Company, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER GRANTING #532 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony M. Goldner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/16/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2014 Filing 532 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Metallo Gasket Co.. (Goldner, Anthony)
May 15, 2014 Filing 530 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sepco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent St. Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation for Sepco Corporation. (Fergus, Sean)
May 15, 2014 Filing 529 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of Sepco Corporation (Fergus, Sean)
May 14, 2014 Filing 528 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #502 Notice of Appearance filed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Attorney Michael McGinley was only added as Attorney of Record for Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Upon speaking with the office of Mr. McGinley, he should represent McMaster-Carr Supply Company in every instance. Attorney McGinley has been added to all McMaster-Carr Supply Company parties. This notice is for information only and no further action is required by the filer (kek)
May 14, 2014 Filing 527 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #514 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Nash Engineering Company, #518 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Wm. Powell Company, #506 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Armstrong Pumps, Inc., #510 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Kraissl Company, Incorporated, #501 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Avocet Enterprises, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (kek)
May 14, 2014 Filing 526 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 525 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 524 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 13, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Wm. Powell Company. See Document #518 for complete Cross Claim.(kek)
May 13, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Nash Engineering Company. See Document #514 for complete Cross Claim.(kek)
May 13, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Kraissl Company, Incorporated. See Document #510 for complete Cross Claim.(kek)
May 13, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. See Document #506 for complete Cross Claim.(kek)
May 13, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Avocet Enterprises, Inc. See Doc. #501 for complete Cross-Claim.(mar)
May 13, 2014 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Spitkovsky, Jr on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spitkovsky, Robert)
May 13, 2014 Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Rae Hansen on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Amy)
May 13, 2014 Filing 519 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E Bettcher on behalf of Metallo Gasket Co. (Bettcher, Karen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 518 The WM Powell Company's ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Wm. Powell Company.(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 5/14/2014 (kek).
May 13, 2014 Filing 517 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to File its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross Claim and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Wm. Powell Company. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 516 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wm. Powell Company. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Wm. Powell Company (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 514 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 5/14/2014 (kek).
May 13, 2014 Filing 513 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to File its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross Claim and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Nash Engineering Company. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 512 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nash Engineering Company. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 511 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Nash Engineering Company (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 510 The Kraissl Company, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Kraissl Company, Incorporated.(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 5/14/2014 (kek).
May 13, 2014 Filing 509 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to File its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross Claim and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Kraissl Company, Incorporated. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 508 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kraissl Company, Incorporated. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Kraissl Company, Incorporated (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 506 Armstrong Pumps, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 5/14/2014 (kek).
May 13, 2014 Filing 505 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to File its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross Claim and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 504 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SA Armstrong, Ltd. for Armstrong Pumps, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 502 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick McGinley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (McGinley, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Filing 501 Avocet Enterprises, Inc. f-k-a Ventfabrics, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Avocet Enterprises, Inc..(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 5/14/2014 (mar).
May 13, 2014 Filing 500 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and for Leave to File its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaim by Avocet Enterprises, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 499 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avocet Enterprises, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
May 13, 2014 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Avocet Enterprises, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
May 12, 2014 Filing 497 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Starnes, William)
May 12, 2014 Filing 496 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Starnes, William)
May 12, 2014 Filing 495 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 494 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 493 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 492 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 491 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 490 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 489 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 488 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 487 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 486 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 485 STRICKEN (Correctly re-filed against all defendants at Doc. 490.) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Fluor Enterprises, Inc. by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 7/9/2014 (bkl).
May 12, 2014 Filing 484 STRICKEN (Correctly re-filed against all defendants at Doc. 489.) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Fluor Corporation by Fluor Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 7/9/2014 (bkl).
May 12, 2014 Filing 483 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 481 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 480 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 479 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 478 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 477 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 12, 2014 Filing 476 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corp.(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp.. (Hill, Keith)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER GRAnTING #465 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant Lear Seigler answer due by May 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/9/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 9, 2014 Filing 474 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #464 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KCG Inc.. See attached document for specifics (cjo)
May 8, 2014 Filing 473 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Rohm and Haas Company. Responses due by 6/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Royce A. Warrick)(Smith, Mark)
May 8, 2014 Filing 472 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rohm and Haas Company identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Rohm and Haas Company. (Smith, Mark)
May 8, 2014 Filing 471 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Smith on behalf of Rohm and Haas Company (Smith, Mark)
May 8, 2014 Filing 470 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mueller Steam Specialty Company. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 469 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Filing 468 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Filing 467 CROSSCLAIM ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE AND OTHER DEFENSES TO ANY COUNTERCLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS FOR CONTRIBUTION AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp..(Chessler, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Filing 466 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KCG Inc.. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 465 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings Out of Time by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Filing 464 STRICKEN - Corporate Disclosure Statement by KCG Inc.. (Page, David) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cjo).
May 2, 2014 Filing 463 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XEF, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent XEF, Inc. for XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
May 2, 2014 Filing 462 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simpson Timber Company identifying Corporate Parent Simpson Investment Company for Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company. (Newport, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 461 ANSWER to Complaint by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 28, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 459 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 456 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Irwin, William)
April 25, 2014 Filing 455 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #448 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KCG Inc. Document filed in the wrong case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2014 Filing 454 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC (Huelsmann, Brian)
April 24, 2014 Filing 453 MOTION To Have All Counterclaims Deemed Filed And Answered Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion To Continue Deadlines To Answer And File Counterclaims by Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2014 Filing 452 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Johnson, Dayna)
April 24, 2014 Filing 451 ANSWER to Complaint /All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 24, 2014 Filing 450 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayna L. Johnson on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Johnson, Dayna)
April 24, 2014 Filing 449 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KCG Inc.. (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 448 ENTRY STRICKEN: Corporate Disclosure Statement by KCG Inc.. (Page, David) Modified on 4/25/2014 (lmb).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER GRANTING #195 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company pleading filed on 4/9/14 #355 ; GRANTING #231 Motion for Leave to File: Defendant Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. responsive pleading to be filed by 4/30/14; GRANTING #408 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #408 ); GRANTING #412 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #413 ); GRANTING #416 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #416 ); GRANTING #418 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #419 ); GRANTING #422 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #423 ); GRANTING #426 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #427 ); GRANTING #430 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #429 ); GRANTING #433 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed at #432 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/24/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2014 Filing 446 Affirmative Defenses to and Answer to All Crossclaims by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 24, 2014 Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of KCG Inc. (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 442 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company (Page, David)
April 23, 2014 Filing 441 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #385 Crossclaim filed by Eaton Corporation, #388 Crossclaim filed by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, #404 Crossclaim filed by Hyster Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
April 22, 2014 Filing 440 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MW Custom Papers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Meadwestvaco Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Capital World Investors, Inc for MW Custom Papers, LLC. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 22, 2014 Filing 439 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers, LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2014 (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 22, 2014 Filing 438 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 22, 2014 Filing 437 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC (Geraci, Carl)
April 22, 2014 Filing 436 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 22, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 434 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Cross-Claims by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 432 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 430 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 429 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 427 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims; against API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Columbia Boiler Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 426 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 425 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Boiler Company identifying Corporate Parent Vari Corporation for Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 423 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to All Cross-Claims; against API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 422 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 421 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 420 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 419 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carrier Corporation.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 418 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 417 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Universal Refractories, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 416 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 415 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Universal Refractories, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 413 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Beazer East, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 412 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Beazer East, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 411 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beazer East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HBMA HOLDINGS LLC for Beazer East, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Beazer East, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 409 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower).(Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 407 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower) (Stevens, Kyler)
April 21, 2014 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Hyster Company (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 21, 2014 Filing 404 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Hyster Company.(Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 403 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyster Company. (Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Hyster Company (Lang, Christopher)
April 18, 2014 Filing 401 RESPONSE in Opposition re #224 MOTION to Remand filed by Boeing Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leatherman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of McCaffery, #3 Exhibit 2A - Exhibits to McCaffery Declaration, #4 Supplement 3 - Declaration of Blake)(Irwin, William)
April 18, 2014 Filing 400 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 399 RESPONSE to #318 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 18, 2014 Filing 398 RESPONSE to #312 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 18, 2014 Filing 397 RESPONSE to #309 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 18, 2014 Filing 396 RESPONSE to #308 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 18, 2014 Filing 395 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #321 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 18, 2014 Filing 394 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #393 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company, #390 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company, #391 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company, #392 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. See attached document for specifics. (kek)
April 17, 2014 Filing 393 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 394 - Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #318 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Henke, Leslie) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kek).
April 17, 2014 Filing 392 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 394 - Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #312 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Henke, Leslie) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kek).
April 17, 2014 Filing 391 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 394 - Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #309 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Henke, Leslie) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kek).
April 17, 2014 Filing 390 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 394 - Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #308 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Henke, Leslie) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kek).
April 17, 2014 Filing 389 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(as successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc.) (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 17, 2014 Filing 388 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(as successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc.).(Lang, Christopher)
April 17, 2014 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(as successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc.) (Lang, Christopher)
April 17, 2014 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 17, 2014 Filing 385 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to any and all Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Eaton Corporation.(Lang, Christopher)
April 17, 2014 Filing 384 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Lang, Christopher)
April 17, 2014 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Lang, Christopher)
April 16, 2014 Filing 382 RESPONSE to #296 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 381 RESPONSE to #294 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 380 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #283 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 16, 2014 Filing 379 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #281 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 378 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #273 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 377 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #272 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 376 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #271 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 375 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #270 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 374 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #269 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 373 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #268 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 372 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #267 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 371 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #266 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 370 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #265 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 369 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #264 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 368 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #263 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 367 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #262 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 366 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #261 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 365 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #260 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 15, 2014 Filing 364 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #259 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 14, 2014 Filing 363 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, Answers to All, CROSSCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Maremont Corporation by Maremont Corporation.(Barke, Ryan)
April 14, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Barke on behalf of Maremont Corporation (Barke, Ryan)
April 11, 2014 Filing 361 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #257 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 11, 2014 Filing 360 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #250 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 10, 2014 Filing 359 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Domco Products Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Enterprises Inc. for Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 358 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf of Domco Products Texas, Inc. (Veath, Beth)
April 9, 2014 Filing 356 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Smith, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 355 Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Cross-Claims, Answers to All Cross Claims and Jury Demand by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Smith, Gary)
April 9, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #353 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Pneumo Abex, LLC. Filer selected "all parties" instead of "all defendants" at the time of filing. This created a cross-defendant party designation for the plaintiff. Clerk's office has removed the plaintiff's party designation as cross-defendant.(bkl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2014 Filing 353 Defendant Pneumo Abex ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Pneumo Abex, LLC.(Titzer, Ross)
April 7, 2014 Filing 352 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #212 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 7, 2014 Filing 351 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #211 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 7, 2014 Filing 350 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #210 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 349 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #142 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 348 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #196 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 347 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #154 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 346 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #144 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 345 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #145 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 344 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #147 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 343 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #149 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 342 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 341 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #141 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
April 1, 2014 Filing 340 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 339 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by BW/IP, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 337 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Plastics Engineering Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company (Bultman, Bradley)
March 31, 2014 Filing 335 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homasote Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Homasote Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 333 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 331 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 329 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 327 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2014 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Quash Service of Process Harco Laboratories, Inc., filed by Michael Burns. (Romani, Allyson)
March 28, 2014 Filing 324 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 323 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnston Boiler Company. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 322 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #140 Crossclaim filed by Gardner Denver, Inc. by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
March 28, 2014 Filing 321 API Heat Transfer, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Anticipated Crossclaims against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer, Inc..(Jones, Stephanie)
March 27, 2014 Filing 320 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #139 Crossclaim of Illinois Tool Works, Inc. by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
March 27, 2014 Filing 319 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 318 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Meyer, Julie)
March 27, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 315 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bird Incorporated. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 27, 2014 Filing 314 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rogers Corporation. (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 313 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ajax Magnethermic Corp.. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 27, 2014 Filing 312 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rogers Corporation.(Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 310 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joy Technologies, Inc.. (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 309 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Joy Technologies, Inc..(Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 308 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Dap, Inc..(Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #304 Crossclaim filed by Dap, Inc. STRICKEN PURSUANT TO FILER REQUEST. (anm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2014 Filing 305 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dap, Inc.. (Irwin, William)
March 27, 2014 Filing 304 STRIKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 306 - CROSSCLAIM and Answer against Dap, Inc., filed by Dap, Inc..(Irwin, William) Modified on 3/27/2014 (anm).
March 27, 2014 Filing 303 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #284 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Ajax Magnethermic Corp., #288 Notice of Appearance filed by Ajax Magnethermic Corp., #282 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Bird Incorporated. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
March 27, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Irwin, William)
March 26, 2014 Filing 301 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Picou, Curtis)
March 26, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (Meyer, Julie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (King, Melanie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 296 Chicago Bridge & Iron Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, Demand for Jury Trial, and, CROSSCLAIM Against All Defendants against Chicago Bridge & Iron Company by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company.(Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 294 Defendant General Electric Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, Demand for Jury Trial and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants against General Electric Company by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 292 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, N.V. for Chicago Bridge & Iron Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 290 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 288 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 303 - NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Meyer, Julie) Modified on 3/27/2014 (anm).
March 26, 2014 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Meyer, Julie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (King, Melanie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Bird Incorporated (King, Melanie)
March 26, 2014 Filing 284 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 303 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ajax Magnethermic Corp..(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 3/27/2014 (anm).
March 26, 2014 Filing 283 Defendant, AJAX MAGNETHERMIC ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ajax Magnethermic Corp..(Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 282 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 303 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 3/27/2014 (anm).
March 26, 2014 Filing 281 Bird Incorporated ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Kidd, Anita)
March 26, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 276 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #133 Crossclaim, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
March 25, 2014 Filing 275 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation(a Delaware corporation, successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.), CBS Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Donahue, Daniel)
March 25, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue on behalf of CBS Corporation(a Delaware corporation, successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.), CBS Corporation(a Delaware corporation) (Donahue, Daniel)
March 25, 2014 Filing 273 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 272 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Phillips 66 Company.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 271 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by All Acquistions, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 270 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 269 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 268 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 267 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 266 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corp.(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 265 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Carbonline Company.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 264 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Certaineed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 263 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 262 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodrich Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 261 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lattner Boiler Company.(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 260 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
March 25, 2014 Filing 259 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
March 24, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #249 Notice of Appearance filed by Armstrong International, Inc. See attached document for specifics (kek)
March 21, 2014 Filing 257 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER to Cross Claims, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross Claims for Contributions against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm & Haas Co., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
March 21, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of Mack Trucks, Inc. (Picou, Curtis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 255 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Picou, Curtis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 253 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Fergus, Sean)
March 21, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
March 21, 2014 Filing 251 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Storm, Carla)
March 21, 2014 Filing 250 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Armstrong International, Inc..(Storm, Carla)
March 21, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Storm on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Storm, Carla)
March 21, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #230 Notice of Appearance filed by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. See attached document for specifics (cekf)
March 20, 2014 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Houdaille Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Pump Group for Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 246 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump Inc identifying Corporate Parent Houdaille Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation, Corporate Parent Viking Pump-Houdaille, Inc. for Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc, Viking Pump Inc. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 245 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seco Warwick Corporation(as successor in interest to Sunbeam Furnaces). (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 244 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 243 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Stoker Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. a Delaware Corporation for Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 242 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 Company. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 241 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 240 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lennox International for Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 239 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent Imo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 238 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 237 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Fairbanks Company. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dana Holding Corporation for Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 235 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certaineed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation, Certaineed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 234 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Acquistions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allegheny Technologies Incorporated for All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC, All Acquistions, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bechtel Group Inc., Corporate Parent Bechtel Construction Operations Incorporated for Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carbonline Company identifying Corporate Parent RPM International Inc. for Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company, Carbonline Company. (Hill, Keith)
March 20, 2014 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings Out of Time by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 20, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. (Chessler, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Newport, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 226 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
March 19, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION to Remand by Michael Burns. Responses due by 4/21/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit)(Romani, Allyson)
March 19, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Michelle Romani on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romani, Allyson)
March 18, 2014 Filing 222 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Muskopf, W.)
March 18, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #209 Affirmative Defenses filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. See attached document for specifics (kek)
March 18, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #216 Notice of Appearance filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc. The event and attachment do not match. This entry is stricken and no further action is required by efiler.(jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2014 Filing 219 ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ford Motor Company.(Ybarra, David)
March 17, 2014 Filing 218 Corporate Disclosure Statement by API Heat Transfer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
March 17, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
March 17, 2014 Filing 216 STRICKEN-NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie) Modified on 3/18/2014 (jlrr).
March 17, 2014 Filing 215 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 214 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 212 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Viking Pump Inc.(Hill, Keith)
March 17, 2014 Filing 211 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Seco Warwick Corporation(as successor in interest to Sunbeam Furnaces).(Hill, Keith)
March 17, 2014 Filing 210 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
March 14, 2014 Filing 209 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 221 - Affirmative Defenses to (and Answer to) ITT Corporation's #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Muskopf, W.) Modified on 3/18/2014 (kek).
March 13, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #184 Notice of Appearance filed by Johnston Boiler Company, #187 Notice of Appearance filed by XEF, Inc., #190 Notice of Appearance filed by Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., #193 Notice of Appearance filed by Simpson Timber Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #194 Answer to Complaint filed by Simpson Timber Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #182 Answer to Complaint filed by ECR International Inc., #181 Notice of Appearance filed by ECR International Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #179 Notice of Appearance filed by ECR International Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 204 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 203 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milwaukee Valve Company. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Denk, Lawrence)
March 12, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
March 12, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
March 12, 2014 Filing 199 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 12, 2014 Filing 198 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 12, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 12, 2014 Filing 196 Defendant Brand Insulations, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Brand Insulations, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 12, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Welply, Justin)
March 12, 2014 Filing 194 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC.207 - Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael) Modified on 3/13/2014 (bkl).
March 12, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 192 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 191 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 189 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by XEF, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 188 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Curtiss Wright Corporation. (Sugg, Reed)
March 12, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed W. Sugg on behalf of Curtiss Wright Corporation (Sugg, Reed)
March 12, 2014 Filing 185 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Johnston Boiler Company.(Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Newport, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 183 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECR International Inc.. (Newton, Lise)
March 12, 2014 Filing 182 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 206 - ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by ECR International Inc..(Newton, Lise) Modified on 3/13/2014 (bkl).
March 12, 2014 Filing 181 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 206 - NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of ECR International Inc. (Newton, Lise) Modified on 3/13/2014 (bkl).
March 12, 2014 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Defendant by ECR International Inc..(Newton, Lise)
March 12, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of ECR International Inc. (Newton, Lise)
March 12, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #175 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Curtiss Wright Corporation. See attached document for specifics (drb)
March 11, 2014 Filing 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foxboro Company identifying Corporate Parent Siebe, Inc for Foxboro Company. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 176 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 175 ENTRY STRICKEN - STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Curtiss Wright Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sugg, Reed) Modified on 3/12/2014 (drb).
March 11, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Viking Pump Inc (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Seco Warwick Corporation(as successor in interest to Sunbeam Furnaces) (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Phillips 66 Company (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Lattner Boiler Company (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Certaineed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Carbonline Company (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of All Acquistions, LLC (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corp.(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling (Hill, Keith)
March 11, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Dean Henke, Jr on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company (Henke, Leslie)
March 11, 2014 Filing 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 154 Defendant York International Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #152 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by York International Corporation. Efiler attached the incorrect document. Docket entry stricken and efiler will refile.(jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 11, 2014 Filing 152 STRICKEN-Defendant York International Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin) Modified on 3/11/2014 (jlrr ).
March 11, 2014 Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.A. Sexauer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Interline Brands, Inc. for J.A. Sexauer, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 150 Defendant J.A. Sexauer Inc's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 149 Defendant Stewart Warner Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Stewart Warner Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 148 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tuthill Corporation. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 147 Defendant Tuthill Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Tuthill Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 145 Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Johnson Controls, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 144 Def Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Rockwell Mfg & Nordstrom Valves Inc, ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Flowserve U.S., Inc..(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 142 Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc..(Welply, Justin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 141 Defendant Invensys Systems, Inc f/k/a The Foxboro Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affifirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Foxboro Company.(Welply, Justin)
March 7, 2014 Filing 140 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Gardner Denver, Inc.(Cantieri, Michael)
March 6, 2014 Filing 139 CROSSCLAIM , Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Any Counterclaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc.(Huelsmann, Brian)
March 6, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Huelsmann, Brian)
March 6, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc (Huelsmann, Brian)
March 6, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #116 Notice of Appearance filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc, #117 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc, #118 Crossclaim filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 5, 2014 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boeing Company, The. (Irwin, William)
March 5, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION for Joinder in Co-Defendant Drane Co's Notice of Removal by Boeing Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories)(Irwin, William)
March 5, 2014 Filing 133 CROSSCLAIM , Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Any Counterclaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation.(Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Boeing Company, The (Irwin, William)
March 5, 2014 Filing 131 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 130 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 128 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 127 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clow Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 126 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holding, Inc. for Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Company. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 123 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ingersoll rand plc for Trane US, Inc.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation (Chessler, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Thermwell Products Co., Inc..(Bunnell, Nicholas)
March 5, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B Bunnell on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Bunnell, Nicholas)
March 5, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #108 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metallo Gasket Co.. See attached document for specifics. (cjo)
March 5, 2014 Filing 118 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 136 - CROSSCLAIM , Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Any Counterclaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc.(Chessler, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2014 (bkl).
March 5, 2014 Filing 117 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 136 - MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Chessler, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2014 (bkl).
March 5, 2014 Filing 116 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 136 - NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc (Chessler, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2014 (bkl).
March 5, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Hultquist on behalf of Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc. (Hultquist, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 114 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Cantieri, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Gardner Denver, Inc.(Cantieri, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Cantieri on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc (Cantieri, Michael)
March 4, 2014 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
March 4, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles)
March 3, 2014 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metallo Gasket Co.. (Goldner, Anthony)
March 3, 2014 Filing 108 STRICKEN - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metallo Gasket Co.. (Goldner, Anthony) Modified on 3/5/2014 (cjo).
March 3, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
March 3, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE by Pneumo Abex, LLC of Adoptions of Pleadings Previously Filed (Titzer, Ross)
March 3, 2014 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
March 3, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Titzer, Ross)
March 3, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Orris, Thomas)
February 27, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome C. Simon on behalf of Harco Laboratories, Incorporated (Simon, Jerome)
February 27, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Harco Laboratories, Incorporated (Ruzicka, Derek)
February 27, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #65 Notice of Appearance filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, #64 Notice of Appearance filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
February 27, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #70 Notice of Appearance filed by Foxboro Company. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
February 27, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ybarra on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ybarra, David)
February 26, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of York International Corporation (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Stewart Warner Corporation (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Foxboro Company (Smith, Gary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of York International Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Stewart Warner Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Foxboro Company (Hatch, Mary)
February 26, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Stewart Warner Corporation (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Quash Service of Process filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. (Ruzicka, Derek)
February 26, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 70 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 99 - NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Foxboro Company (Welply, Justin) Modified on 2/27/2014 (anm).
February 26, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Foxboro Company (Welply, Justin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Ward, Donald)
February 26, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Ward, Donald)
February 26, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Quash Service of Process by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ruzicka, Derek)
February 26, 2014 Filing 65 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 100 - NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome C. Simon on behalf of Harco Laboratories, Incorporated (Simon, Jerome) Modified on 2/27/2014 (anm).
February 26, 2014 Filing 64 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 100 - NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Harco Laboratories, Incorporated (Ruzicka, Derek) Modified on 2/27/2014 (anm).
February 26, 2014 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc.. (Douglas, Celia)
February 26, 2014 Filing 62 Defendant T hermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Individually And For Its Subsidiary Loftus Furnance Company's Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc..(Douglas, Celia)
February 26, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Celia K. Douglas on behalf of Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc. (Douglas, Celia)
February 26, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf of Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc. (Heidenreich, Roger)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge David R. Herndon recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson to serve as presiding judge for all further proceedings. Should any party object to this assignment, they must notify the undersigned on or before March 11, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/26/14. (klh, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Patrick Eckler on behalf of FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc. (Eckler, Donald)
February 25, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Patrick Eckler on behalf of BP Products North America, Inc. (Eckler, Donald)
February 25, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Patrick Eckler on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company (Eckler, Donald)
February 25, 2014 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Flowserve U.S., Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dravo Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Dravo Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dravo Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Lindberg.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Lindberg (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Greene Tweed & Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIC-WIL, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by RIC-WIL, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Weil McLain.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil McLain (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Dezurik.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dezurik (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compudyne Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Compudyne Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 25, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Compudyne Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
February 24, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Lively on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Lively, Jonathan)
February 24, 2014 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company. (Felkins, Jill)
February 24, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Marie Felkins on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Felkins, Jill)
February 24, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company (Cowan, Tracy)
February 24, 2014 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
February 24, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Rheem Manufacturing Company.(Thames, Earl)
February 24, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl B. Thames, Jr on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company (Thames, Earl)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/24/2014. (jdh)
February 21, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Goldner on behalf of Metallo Gasket Co. (Goldner, Anthony)
February 21, 2014 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc.. (Newton, Lise)
February 21, 2014 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc..(Newton, Lise)
February 21, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Newton, Lise)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael J. Reagan recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 02/21/14. (dkd )
February 21, 2014 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquistions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carbonline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certaineed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, ECR International Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluror Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Compnay, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mack Trucks, Inc., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifan Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Thermo Fischer Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, Wm. Powell Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2014 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation. (Rogers, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Rogers on behalf of ITT Corporation (Rogers, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of ITT Corporation (Wilks, Undray)
February 21, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #2 Notice of Removal, by Pratt & Whitney Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shultz, William)
February 20, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Riley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (Riley, Melanie)
February 20, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Elizabeth Bode on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company (Bode, Anne)
February 20, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jeffrey Muskopf on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company (Muskopf, W.)
February 19, 2014 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pratt & Whitney Company.(Shultz, William)
February 19, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pratt & Whitney Company from Madison County, IL, case number 13-L-2148. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2203835) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Shultz, William)
February 19, 2014 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-cv-232-MJR/SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jlrr )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. AERCO International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden North America, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbonline Company
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harco Laboratories, Incorporated
Represented By: Jerome C. Simon
Represented By: Derek Ruzicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resco Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraissl Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Margaret M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Dyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Steam Specialty Company
Represented By: David J. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCord Gasket Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn N. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Picou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Brian J. Huelsmann
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coleman Company, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Margaret M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compudyne Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Represented By: Lawrence S. Denk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Represented By: L. Alexa Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Represented By: Derek Ruzicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Acquistions, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treco Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AERCO International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Warner Corporation
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: W. Jeffrey Muskopf
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Bode
Represented By: L. Dean Henke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seco Warwick Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm & Haas Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International Inc
Represented By: Bryan L. Skelton
Represented By: William B. Starnes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm and Haas Company
Represented By: Mark Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Kamp Veath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham, LLC
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: