Knasinski et al v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Knasinski and Janet Knasinski
Defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation, Aldrich Pump Company, Asbestos Corporation LTD., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carver Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Eaton Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, FMC Corporation, Foster Engineering, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Gould Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Icon Management Services, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Melrath Gasket, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Oakfabco, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Company, Peerless Industries, Pneumo Abex LLC, RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., William Powell Company and York International Corporation
Cross_claimant: Brand Insulations, Inc., ITT Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Crane Co., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Carver Pump Company, Patterson Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., York International Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Viking Pumps, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Carrier Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC and John Crane, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation, Aldrich Pump Company, Asbestos Corporation LTD., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham LLC, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Carver Pump Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Foster Engineering, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Gould Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Corporation, Icon Management Services, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Melrath Gasket, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Oakfabco, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Company, Peerless Industries, Pneumo Abex LLC, RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., William Powell Company, York International Corporation and Brand Insulations, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00399
Filed: March 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 CLERK'S JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/3/15. (rah)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER, granting 382 without prejudice MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Aldrich Pump Company filed by Janet Knasinski, Jerome Knasinski. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/1/2015. (jdh)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiffs' Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Burnham LLC (Doc. 258 ); Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Burnham LLC (Doc. 257 ); Plaintiffs' Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Doc . 260 ); Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Doc. 259 ); Plaintiffs' Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corps. (Doc. 262 ); and Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Vale Corps. (Doc. 261 ) are STRICKEN. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/29/2014. (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knasinski et al v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Knasinski
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Eric D. Jackstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Knasinski
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Eric D. Jackstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Pump Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Boiler Company
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrath Gasket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Patterson Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aldrich Pump Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Asbestos Corporation LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gould Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Icon Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnston Boiler Company
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Melrath Gasket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Patterson Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Peerless Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?