A.S. v. E.H. et al
Plaintiff: A.S.
Defendant: E.H., Stephen Hauser, Tara Hauser, Jessica Drake, Benjamin Howes, Freeburg Community High School District No. 77 and O'Fallon Township High School District No 203
Respondent: Illinois High School Association
Case Number: 3:2014cv00583
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss.This case is now closed. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/25/17. (lmp)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 102 Sealed Motion. The Court GRANTS summary judgment on counts XII, XIII, XIV, and XVI. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/31/16. (lmp)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 109 Sealed Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply Brief. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/5/15. (lmp)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by O'Fallon Township High School District No 203, denying as moot 81 MOTION to Dismiss O'Fallon Township High School District No. 203 filed by Aubrie Spinka. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/16/15. (lmp)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER, granting 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jessica Drake, granting 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Freeburg Community High School District No. 77, granting 50 M OTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by O'Fallon Township High School District No 203, granting in part, denying in part 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Benjamin Howes. The Court grants plaintiff leave to file a second amended complaint as to Counts IX, X, XI, XII, and XVI on or before April 8, 2015. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/25/15. (lmp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S. v. E.H. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Matthew T. Nagel
Represented By: Daniel J. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.H.
Represented By: Matthew P. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hauser
Represented By: Dayna L. Johnson
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Hauser
Represented By: Dayna L. Johnson
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Drake
Represented By: Lauren E. Abbott
Represented By: Robert L. Jackstadt
Represented By: Merry C. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Howes
Represented By: Lauren E. Abbott
Represented By: Robert L. Jackstadt
Represented By: Merry C. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeburg Community High School District No. 77
Represented By: Lauren E. Abbott
Represented By: Robert L. Jackstadt
Represented By: Merry C. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Fallon Township High School District No 203
Represented By: David P. Bub
Represented By: Brandon B. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Illinois High School Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?