Lamon v. Stephens et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Lamon
Defendant: Doug Stephens, Sandra Funk and Edward W Huntley
Case Number: 3:2014cv01051
Filed: September 30, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, for the purposes of discovery and trial, the Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Lamon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-1129-JPG-PMF) with Lamon v. Stephens, (Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF) and Lamon v. Kerr, (Case Number 15-cv-00945-JPG -PMF). All future filing shall bear the consolidated caption used in this order and shall be filed only in Lamon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-1129-JPG-PMF). The Court will strike any filings in Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF and 15-cv-00945-JPG-PMF subsequent to this order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CONSOLIDATE these cases and to file a copy of this Order all three cases. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/16/2015. (jdh)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiffs Combined Motion for Hearing (Doc. 24 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw Complaint against Two (2) Defendants (Doc. 18 ) is GRANTED and Defendants Doug Stephen and Edward W. Huntley are DISMISSED without prej udice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly at the conclusion of this matter. Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate Cases (Doc. 20 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, for the purposes of discovery and trial, the Court hereby CONSOLIDATES L amon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-1129-JPG-PMF) with Lamon v. Stephens, (Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF). All future filing shall bear the consolidated caption used in this order and shall be filed only in Lamon v. Schuler. (Case Number 13-cv-112 9-JPG-PMF). The Court will strike any filings in Case Number 14-cv-001051-JPG-PMF subsequent to this order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CONSOLIDATE these cases to file a copy of this Order in both cases. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/23/2015. (jdh)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Reagan no longer assigned to case, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrat e Judge Philip M. Frazier. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that COUNTS 1 and 3 are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that COUNT 2, the First Amendment retaliation claim, shall otherwise PROCEED against Defendants DOUG STEPHENS, SANDRA FU NK and EDWARD W. HUNTLEY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the prayer for termination of employment, criminal prosecution, fines and/or imprisonment are DISMISSED. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 14-cv-1051-JPG-PMF, until further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants DOUG STEPHENS, SANDRA FUNK and EDWARD W. HUNTLEY. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/30/2014. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamon v. Stephens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?